Perez v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Original Case: 1:18-cv-05990
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01728 |
Type | civil / united states / social security |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 30, 2019 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New contact info |
Plaintiff - Appellant
Paul L. Perez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/30/2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Paul L. Perez, FILED. [2586326] 19-1728 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:49 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2586329] 19-1728 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:52 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2586330] 19-1728 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:53 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2586332] 19-1728 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Paul L. Perez, FILED. Service date 06/12/2019 by no service.[2586338] 19-1728 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:58 PM] |