Siddiqui v. Rocheleau
Original Case: 3:18-cv-00839
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01729 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 06, 2020 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Eric Rocheleau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Faiz Siddiqui
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/06/2020 4:24 AM EDT |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Faiz Siddiqui, FILED. [2586284] 19-1729 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 05/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2586300] 19-1729 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:26 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2586302] 19-1729 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:28 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Faiz Siddiqui, district court receipt # CTXN00019445, FILED.[2586303] 19-1729 [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:29 PM] |