Genao v. Goldstein & Weinstein, LLP
Original Case: 1:19-cv-03404
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01730 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2019 3:32 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Goldstein & Weinstein, LLP
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Elvin Genao
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/15/2019 3:29 AM EST |
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Elvin Genao, FILED. [2586341] 19-1730 [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:03 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2586346] 19-1730 [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:05 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2586347] 19-1730 [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:06 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2586349] 19-1730 [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:08 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Elvin Genao, FILED. No Service.[2586352] 19-1730 [Entered: 06/13/2019 01:12 PM] |