American Zurich Insurance Company et al v. Kumho Tire Co., Inc. et al
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey L Viken |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-05044 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 14, 2019 3:29 AM CST |
Defendant
Kumho Tire Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kumho Tire (Vietnam) CO., LTD.
|
|
Plaintiff
American Zurich Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heavy Constructors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/30 4:30 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/30/19. (SB) |
|
utility
Remark
Wed 07/31 2:39 PM
NO FURTHER DOCKETING IN THIS CASE. ALL FURTHER DOCKETING TO BE DONE IN LEAD CASE 18-5036 (DJP) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire Co., Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery.(CLR) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued, | ||
Att: 2 AO 85 | ||
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire (Vietnam) CO., LTD.. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff.(TAL) |
|
Att: 1 AO 85, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/26 4:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/15 6:07 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sei Joon (Steve) Park. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/15/19. (SB) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/15 6:06 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Scott Toomey. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/15/19. (SB) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/15 12:48 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 4:24 PM
MOTION for Attorney Sei Joon (Steve) Park to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3106418) by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 4:23 PM
MOTION for Attorney C. Scott Toomey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3106405) by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rory King on behalf of Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/08 5:12 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan L. Woody. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/8/19. (SB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/08 4:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action , filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/18 3:09 PM
MOTION for Attorney Ryan L. Woody to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3087320) by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/17 5:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire Co., Inc., Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery.(JLS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Kumho Tire Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons Kumho Tire U.S.A., | ||
Att: 3 AO 85 form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 06/17 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3086068) filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc. in shell case on 6/17/19. (JLS) |