Patrick v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01440 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Northern, 5:19-cv-00460 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2019 2:34 AM CST |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Depuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Patrick
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 01/20 12:52 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/19 2:34 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - List of Plaintiffs | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 06/19 2:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Waiver sent on 4/25/2019; Depuy Inc. Waiver sent on 4/25/2019; Johnson & Johnson. Waiver sent on 4/25/2019; Johnson & Johnson International. Waiver sent on 4/25/2019; Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Waiver sent on 4/25/2019. (Goldstein, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Public Entry)
Tue 06/18 1:37 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00460. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Transferring to Another District
Tue 06/18 11:41 AM
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #318. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Texas for inclusion into MDL-2244 DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc, Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. James Edgar Kinkeade, U.S. District Judge. (plp) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf . (see) [Transferred from New York Northern on 6/18/2019.] | |
3 | 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/15/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 6/18/2019.] | |
2 | 2 Summonses Issued as to DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(hmr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 6/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to DePuy, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson International | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4716517) filed by Sharon Patrick.(hmr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 6/18/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |