Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-30088

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:19-ap-03039
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2019
Terminated:Apr 13, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico
Lowenstein Sandler LLP One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico
contact info
Defendant
York County
Lowenstein Sandler LLP One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
York County
contact info
Plaintiff
PG&E Corporation
77 Beale Street PO Box 770000
San Francisco, CA 94177
Represented By
Thomas B. Rupp
Keller And Benvenutti LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pacific Gas and Electric Company
77 Beale Street PO Box 770000
San Francisco, CA 94177
Represented By
Thomas B. Rupp
Keller And Benvenutti LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/13 9:39 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:19-ap-3039. (dc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/28 12:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Reorganized Debtors Response to Order to Show Cause Concerning Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Other Prof. Prime Clerk LLC Related [+]. (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 27 Response
Saturday, March 26, 2022
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Sat 03/26 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 03/26/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order to Dismiss Case
Thursday, March 24, 2022
28 28 order Dismiss Case Thu 03/24 3:55 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 4/7/2022. (lp)
Related: [-] 25 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
court Hearing Dropped Thu 03/24 3:57 PM
Hearing Dropped. The hearing on 3/29/22 at 10:00 a.m. is taken off calendar. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 25 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
27 27 misc Response Tue 03/22 5:45 PM
Response Reorganized Debtors' Response to Order to Show Cause Concerning Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 25 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
Sunday, February 20, 2022
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/20 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
Thursday, February 17, 2022
25 25 order Show Cause for Dismissal Fri 02/18 3:39 PM
Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Related [+]. Show Cause hearing scheduled for 3/29/2022 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Response due by 3/22/2022. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/03 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Notice of Filing of Transcript and Deadlines Related to Restriction and Redaction Filed by Other Prof. Prime Clerk LLC. (Baer, Herb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
23 23 order Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/28 3:31 PM
Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 2
22 22 misc Acknowledgment of Request for Transcript Wed 08/28 8:14 AM
Acknowledgment of Request for Transcript Received on 8/26/2019. Related [+]. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 19 Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
21 21 court Transcript Wed 08/28 8:11 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/27/2019 RE: DEBTORS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO IN RE PG&E CORP. SECURITIES LITIG., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. CAL.)2 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber eScribers, LLC; 973-406-2250 . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/4/2019. Redaction Request Due By 09/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/30/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/26/2019. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
20 20 audio audio Tue 08/27 3:46 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/27/2019 9:31:22 AM ]. File Size [ 8860 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:36:55 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Transcript Order Form (Public Request) Tue 08/27 10:13 AM
Transcript Order Form regarding Hearing Date 8/27/2019 Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
court Hearing Held (Adv) Tue 08/27 10:32 AM
Hearing Held. Appearances noted on the record. The matter stand submitted. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company
court Transcript Record Transmittal Tue 08/27 3:30 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded) for Order Number: 19-03039 19 Regarding Hearing Date: 8/27/2019. Transcription Service Provider: e-Scribers, Contact Information: operations@escribers.net Related [+]. (myt)
Related: [-] 19 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Sunday, August 25, 2019
order Judge Docket Order Sun 08/25 7:51 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) On the motion for preliminary injunction argument on August 27, 2019, at 9:30 AM, each side will have twenty minutes; Debtors may reserve a portion of their time for rebuttal. Related [+]. (Montali, Dennis)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Friday, August 16, 2019
court Hearing Dropped Fri 08/16 4:06 PM
Hearing Dropped. The Scheduling Conference on 8/27 is taken off calendar per the Order Regarding Scheduling (dkt #18) filed on 8/6/19. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Thursday, August 15, 2019
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 08/15 5:54 PM
Hearing Rescheduled. The scheduling conference on 8/28/19 is rescheduled to 8/27/19 at 9:30 a.m. ontinued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 08/27/2019 at 09:30 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
18 18 order Stipulation Tue 08/06 4:24 PM
Order Regarding Scheduling Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
17 17 stip Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/06 12:17 PM
Stipulation, and Agreement for Order Regarding Scheduling Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company Related [+]. (Benvenutti, Peter)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
Monday, August 05, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Continued Hearing Mon 08/05 12:30 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing on Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2019 at 09:30 AM San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali for 2 ,. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Thursday, August 01, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/01 4:40 PM
Notice of Hearing on Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2019 at 09:30 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
14 14 misc Reply Thu 08/01 4:37 PM
Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Debtors' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In Re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Friday, July 19, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/19 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Michelson, Randy)
Related: [-] 12 Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, July 18, 2019
12 12 misc Opposition Brief/Memorandum Thu 07/18 7:08 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Debtors' Motion For Preliminary Injunction As To In Re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Michelson, Randy)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Counsel
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Reservation of Rights
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Lehman Motion
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Refco Response
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Northwest Airlines Transcript Pages
Thursday, June 27, 2019
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/27 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program Information Sheet, Debtors Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief as to in re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig,. 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.), Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Order Re Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference Filed by Other Prof. Prime Clerk LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Summons Issued,6 Discovery Order
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/25 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Robert J Rubel Regarding Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Other Prof. Prime Clerk LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herb)
Related: [-] 6 Discovery Order
Monday, June 24, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Robert J. Rubel Regarding Order re Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference Filed by Other Prof. Prime Clerk LLC Related [+]. (Baer, Herb)
Related: [-] 6 Discovery Order
Thursday, June 20, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/20 2:10 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/20 2:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
6 6 order Discovery Wed 06/19 1:26 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference. (dc) Additional attachment(s) (Notice of Recipients) added on 6/19/2019 (dc)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 06/19 1:25 PM
Summons Issued on Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico Answer Due 7/19/2019; York County Answer Due 7/19/2019 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM at San Francisco Courtroom 17 - Montali. (dc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
4 4 notice Notice Tue 06/18 8:07 PM
Notice Regarding Time to Respond to Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff PG&E Corporation, Plaintiff Pacific Gas and Electric Company
3 3 misc Declaration Tue 06/18 7:57 PM
Declaration of Elizabeth Collier in Support of Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 06/18 7:44 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Debtors Motion for a Preliminary Injunction as to In re PG&E Corp. Securities Litig., 18-CV-03509 (N.D. Cal.) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed by Plaintiffs PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/18 7:28 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-03039 . 72 (Injunctive relief - other) Complaint by PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company against Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, York County. Fee Amount $350. (Rupp, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet