Magee v. Ensco Offshore Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-00468 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:0688 Jones Act Suit |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 09, 2014 6:08 PM CST |
Cross Claimant
Ensco Offshore Co
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Royal Eagle Service L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ensco Offshore Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hornbeck Offshore Services L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Royal Eagle Service L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Broderick Magee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
60 | 60
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 07/31 2:08 PM
ORDER of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED the59 Joint Motion to Dismiss is granted, any and all claims asserted by Plaintiff, Broderick Magee, against Defendants, ENSCO Offshore Co, Royal Eagle Services L L C and Hornbeck Offshore Services L L C are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/30/2015. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
59 | 59
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 07/23 3:00 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss , With Prejudice by All Parties.(aty,Coreil, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/23/2015 to edit filers. (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order |