Sweet et al v. DeVos et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-03674 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2019 1:11 AM PST |
Defendant
Elisabeth DeVos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tresa Apodaca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chenelle Archibald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Deegan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Hood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Jacobson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Sweet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/27 3:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Kyra Taylor Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs 6 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/27 3:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Toby Merrill Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs 5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/27 3:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Joshua Rovenger Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs 4 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 06/25 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Elisabeth DeVos, U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 06/25 10:31 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 06/25 7:10 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/25 6:40 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13464603.) filed by Tresa Apodaca, Chenelle Archibald, Alicia Davis, Daniel Deegan, Samuel Hood, Jessica Jacobson, Theresa Sweet.(Taylor, Kyra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/25 5:20 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13464586.) filed by Tresa Apodaca, Chenelle Archibald, Alicia Davis, Daniel Deegan, Samuel Hood, Jessica Jacobson, Theresa Sweet.(Merrill, Toby) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/25 5:16 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13464585.) filed by Tresa Apodaca, Chenelle Archibald, Alicia Davis, Daniel Deegan, Samuel Hood, Jessica Jacobson, Theresa Sweet.(Rovenger, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 06/25 5:10 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Tresa Apodaca, Chenelle Archibald, Alicia Davis, Daniel Deegan, Samuel Hood, Jessica Jacobson, Theresa Sweet (Connor, Eileen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 06/25 2:57 AM
Proposed Summons. (Connor, Eileen) |
|
1 | 1
62
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 2:52 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13464570.). Filed byAlicia Davis, Daniel Deegan, Jessica Jacobson, Chenelle Archibald, Samuel Hood, Theresa Sweet, Tresa Apodaca.(Connor, Eileen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |