Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-23185

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:19-ap-08270
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2019
Terminated:May 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.
PO Box 160
Elmsford, NY 10523
Represented By
Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lana Wilk
6659 West 79th St. Apt. No. 1-S
Burbank, IL 60459
Represented By
Linda M. Tirelli
Tirelli Law Group, LLC
contact info
Tom Zimmerman
Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Sunday, June 07, 2020
21 21 misc Transcript Mon 06/08 12:43 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/30/20 at 12:01 P.M. RE: Pre-Trial Hearing; Motion To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Debtors Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/8/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Transcription Services.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/15/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/8/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/8/2020. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-] ument(S)11
Monday, May 11, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/11 3:35 PM
Adversary Case 7:19-ap-8270 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
20 20 order Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/04 11:09 AM
Order signed on 5/4/2020 Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, February 14, 2020
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 02/14 11:59 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Aaron Maxwell Krieger on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Krieger, Aaron)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, February 13, 2020
18 18 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 02/13 2:49 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of (I) Pre-Trial Conference and (II) Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Adversary Proceeding filed by Aaron Maxwell Krieger on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Krieger, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
17 17 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 01/27 12:04 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of (I) Pre-Trial Conference and (II) Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Aaron Maxwell Krieger on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Krieger, Aaron)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 11/26 12:29 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Wilamowsky, Steven)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, November 21, 2019
15 15 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 11/21 2:24 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of (I) Pre-Trial Conference and (II) Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Adversary Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Related [+] filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Wilamowsky, Steven)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, August 22, 2019
14 14 misc Letter Thu 08/22 4:34 PM
Letter re: Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Hearing Scheduled for September 12, 2019 to November 14 at 10:00 AM Filed by Linda M. Tirelli on behalf of Lana Wilk. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) (Tirelli, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 07/23 5:05 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Wilamowsky, Steven)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, July 18, 2019
12 12 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/18 5:06 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Wilamowsky, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
11 11 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/12 3:27 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Debtor's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 9/5/2019, (Wilamowsky, Steven)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/03 12:23 PM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Filed by Linda M. Tirelli on behalf of Lana Wilk. (Tirelli, Linda)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
9 9 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 07/02 4:10 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 8/1/2019. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 07/02 4:04 PM
[Disregard - refer to Doc. 9] Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 8/1/2019. (Rai, Narotam) Modified on 7/2/2019 (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/02 9:51 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Matthew C. De Re on behalf of Lana Wilk. (De Re, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
6 6 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/01 3:30 PM
Order signed on 6/28/2019 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew C. De Re to represent Lana Wilk Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, June 28, 2019
5 5 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/28 10:42 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Tom Zimmerman on behalf of Lana Wilk. (Zimmerman, Tom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
4 4 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/27 2:54 PM
Order signed on 6/27/2019 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 06/27 9:23 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Matthew C. De Re on behalf of Lana Wilk. (De Re, Matthew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 06/27 9:26 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 19-08270 rdd] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13287259. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #3
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
2 2 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Wed 06/26 4:26 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Tom Zimmerman on behalf of Lana Wilk. (Zimmerman, Tom)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 06/26 4:30 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 19-08270 rdd] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B13286750. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #2
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 06/25 3:47 PM
Adversary case 19-08270 Complaint against Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Linda M. Tirelli on behalf of Lana Wilk. (Tirelli, Linda)
Related: [-]