Blackjewel L.L.C. and Lone Mountain Processing, LLC
West Virginia Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Benjamin A Kahn |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30289 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Blackjewel L.L.C.
1051 Main St
Milton, WV 25541-1215 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 Robert C. Byrd U.S. Courthouse 300 Virginia Street, East
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Represented By
|
1. | Bankrupt Coal Miner Blackjewel Searches for Funding to Restart Operations (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 07/16/2019 | |
2. | Seven Bombshells in the Blackjewel Bankruptcy - Sightline Institute (sightline.org) |
Submitted Wed 07/10/2019 | |
3. | Two Wyoming coal mines close, send 700 workers home after bankruptcy filing (trib.com) |
Submitted Tue 07/02/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Sunday, March 10, 2024 | ||
3881 | 3881
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 03/11 1:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:3879 Order on Application for Administrative Expenses. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
3880 | 3880
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 03/11 1:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related Document:3878 Order on Application for Administrative Expenses. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
3879 | 3879
order
Administrative Expenses
Fri 03/08 12:02 PM
Agreed Order Regarding3365 Administrative Expense Claim filed by Southern Minerals, Inc. Transmitted to Liquidation Trustee with Instructions for Mailing. (mfj) |
|
3878 | 3878
order
Administrative Expenses
Fri 03/08 11:56 AM
Agreed Order Regarding3782 Application For Administrative Expense Claim filed by Wyoming Machinery Company. Transmitted to Liquidation Trustee with Instructions for Mailing. (mfj) |
|
3877 | 3877
misc
Proposed Agreed Order
Fri 03/08 11:00 AM
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER submitted by Trustee Blackjewel Liquidation Trust Re:3365 Application for Administrative Expenses,3799 Objection,3804 Response,3852 Reply,3857 Order (Misc. Relief). (Lerner, Stephen) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
3876 | 3876
misc
Proposed Agreed Order
Mon 03/04 11:20 AM
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER submitted by Trustee Blackjewel Liquidation Trust Re:1309 Application for Administrative Expenses,1452 Amended Application,1822 Amended Application,3782 Application for Administrative Expenses. (Lerner, Stephen) |