MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. ROSADO
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley R Chesler |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-15000 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2020 4:36 AM EST |
Defendant
ALLEN CHRISTOPHER ROSADO
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 173.220.129.10
Terminated: 11/22/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 11/26 3:57 PM
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses Allen Christopher Rosado ("Defendant") from this action without prejudice. Defendant was assigned the IP address 173.220.129.10; etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/26/2019. (sms) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty)
Mon 11/25 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of John Doe by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/22 3:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLEN CHRISTOPHER ROSADO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 11/22 1:00 PM
Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Fri 11/22 9:15 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC as to ALLEN CHRISTOPHER ROSADO.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 11/22 9:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEN CHRISTOPHER ROSADO, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/22 3:13 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 Second MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) |
||
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/21 3:55 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH IT HAS TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE DEFENDANT; granting6 Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time Within Which it has to Serve John Doe Defendant with a Summons and Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall have until November 22, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/18/2019. (sms) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/09 11:51 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Ti) |
||
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/07 4:52 PM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/20 10:36 AM
LETTER ORDER; granting4 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference. Plaintiff may serve Optimum with a subpoena pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 within 30 days of this Order; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/19/2019. (sms) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/05 11:38 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/01 9:09 AM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 8 Certification of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Thu 07/11 4:10 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (bt, ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 9:46 AM
Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 173.220.129.10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9804742) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Certification of Interested Parties |