Charming Charlie LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11534
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11534
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-11537 |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Charming Charlie LLC
6001 Savoy Dr Ste 600
Houston, TX 77036-3365 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Charming Charlie going out of business, will close all 261 stores in Chapter 11 bankruptcy (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/11/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Tue 07/26 3:07 PM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Withdrawal of Claim . Filed by Linda K. Worsfold. (MB) Modified on 7/26/2022 (MB) |
|
11 | 11
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Tue 07/26 10:04 AM
Withdrawal of Claim . Filed by Linda K. Worsfold. (MB) |
|
10 | 10
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Tue 07/26 10:03 AM
Withdrawal of Claim . Filed by Linda K. Worsfold. (MB) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 03/21 1:16 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Address Change - Notice
Thu 09/24 12:15 PM
Notice of Address Change Filed by Facebook Inc.. (DMC) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Address Change - Notice
Fri 03/27 12:30 PM
Notice of Address Change Filed by Facebook Inc . (JS) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 08/26 11:43 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Charming Charlie LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 08/26 11:35 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Charming Charlie LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Fri 07/12 4:05 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of: Charming Charlie Holdings Inc. Case No. 19-11534 Charming Charlie Canada LLC, Case No. 19-11535 Charming Charlie International LLC Case No. 19-11536 Charming Charlie LLC, Case No. 19-11537 Charming Charlie Manhattan LLC, Case No. 19-11538 Charming Charlie USA, Inc., Case No. 19-11539 and Poseidon Partners CMS, Inc., Case No. 19-11540 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 19-11534 (CSS) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Thu 07/11 4:37 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Charming Charlie Holdings Inc.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 07/11 3:44 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11537 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9375077, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
37
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 07/11 3:28 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Charming Charlie LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 07/11 8:20 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (LB) |