ALDRED v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | David S Cercone |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00838 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2020 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant
ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CITY OF PITTSBURGH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT ALDRED
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Evaluator
DAVID B. WHITE
Terminated: 10/07/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/16 2:39 PM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by ROBERT ALDRED. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/16/2020. (kly) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty)
Wed 01/15 11:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERT ALDRED. (Hollis, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Statistical Case Closing
Wed 10/09 12:11 PM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The court having been advised that a settlement has been reached as to all aspects of plaintiff's complaint, the Clerk is directed to mark the case closed. Jurisdiction is retained over the completion and enforcement of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/9/19. (mwm) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
adr
Report of Early Neutral Evaluation
Mon 10/07 9:55 AM
REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation Case has been resolved. DAVID B. WHITE terminated. Attorney David B. White terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. ENE session was held held on 10/4/2019. (White, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Errata
Tue 10/01 3:18 PM
Errata re16 Brief in Support of Motion, by ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK. Reason for Correction: Correcting title of document to match filing event and adding case number to caption. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 09/27 10:21 PM
BRIEF in Support re15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 09/27 10:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/10 1:41 PM
ORDER implementing Rule 502(d) at the Joint Request of the Parties. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/10/19. (kak) |
|
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 09/10 1:37 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. David B. White, Esquire is appointed as an evaluator. ENE conference shall be conducted by 11/29/19. The report of Evaluator shall be electronically filed within 7 days of the ENE conference. Julie E. Koren, Esquire is designated as lead counsel. Evaluator DAVID B. WHITE is added. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/10/19. (kak) |
|
12 | 12
order
Case Management Order
Tue 09/10 1:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 1/3/2020. Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 2/7/2020. Defendant Expert Reports due by 3/6/2020. Expert Discovery to be completed by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 6/3/2020. Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 7/1/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/15/2020. Summary Judgment due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/10/19. (kak) |
|
Monday, September 02, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/02 6:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK, filed by ROBERT ALDRED. (Hollis, Todd) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/30 10:05 AM
ORDER - Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2019 and responsive pleading(s) due by 9/27/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/30/19. (mwm) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Initial Case Management Conference
Thu 08/29 1:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S. Cercone: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/28/2019. The Clerk confirmed with counsel that all prerequisites for the ADR process have been completed. Attorney Koren designated as liaison counsel for ADR purposes. The parties have selected early neutral evaluation to be conducted before David White, Esquire. The ADR session must be completed by 11/29/19. Jury-trial CMO with fact discovery through 1/3/20 and expert discovery through 5/1/20, a Rule 502(d) order and an ADR referral order to follow. (Court Reporter: None) (mwm) (Court Reporter: none) (mwm) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 08/20 5:27 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Koren, Julie) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Stipulation Selecting ADR process
Tue 08/20 5:00 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/08 9:34 AM
ORDER granting5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other response to complaint due by 9/6/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/8/19. (njt) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/07 11:48 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD Answer due from OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY on 9/6/2019; CITY OF PITTSBURGH on 9/6/2019; OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK on 9/6/2019; OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS on 9/6/2019; ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD on 9/6/2019. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/17 10:57 AM
ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 8/28/19 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 8/9/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/17/19. (njt) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Wed 07/17 10:48 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie E. Koren on behalf of ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK. (Koren, Julie) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Mon 07/15 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny Court of Common Pleas, case number GD 19-1728 Copies attached: Complaint, Praecipe for Appearance, Praecipe to Reinstate Complaint and Amended Complaint. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5208869), filed by OFFICER LOGAN HANLEY, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, OFFICER MICHAEL SOROCZAK, OFFICER JOSHUA MATTHEWS, ACTING CHIEF OF POLICE REGINA MCDONALD. (nll) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |