MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 184.152.100.54
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Madeline Cox Arleo |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-15444 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2020 3:19 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 184.152.100.54
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 10/31 3:42 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF JOHN DOE. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/31/2019. (sm) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty)
Mon 10/28 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of John Doe by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/16 11:49 AM
ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion requesting for an extension of time to serve process. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with the Summons and Complaint by 11/28/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/16/2019. (dam, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/15 2:46 PM
MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/15 3:00 PM
Set Deadlines as to6 Plaintiff's MOTION For Extension of Time Within Which it has to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/01 3:54 PM
LETTER OPINION and ORDER granting4 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to serve a Third-Party Subpoena. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/1/2019. (dam, ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/01 9:12 AM
MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 8 Certification of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/01 11:11 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 Plaintiff's MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Wed 07/17 3:27 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (bt, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 6:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 6:30 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 184.152.100.54 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820324) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(CERILLO, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Certification of Interested Parties | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/17 12:00 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) |