STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al v. MNUCHIN et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-06642 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2020 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
Charles P Rettig
Washington, DC 20224
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven T. Mnuchin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
1. | Three States Sue Trump Administration Over Federal Tax Changes (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/18/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
80 | 80
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 04/01 4:27 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:79 Memorandum Opinion & Order. in favor of Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury, Charles P Rettig, Steven T. Mnuchin against State of Connecticut, State of New Jersey, State of New York. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 30, 2024, Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are granted, and Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment are denied. Judgment is entered for the Defendants and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/30/2024) (nd) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of right to appeal | ||
79 | 79
60
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 04/01 9:35 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (59 in 1:19-cv-06642-PGG) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment . filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Charles P Rettig, Internal Revenue Service, Steven T. Mnuchin, (46 in 1:19-cv-06654-PGG) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Village of Scarsdale, New York, (57 in 1:19-cv-06642-PGG) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of New York, (44 in 1:19-cv-06654-PGG) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment . filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Charles P Rettig, Internal Revenue Service, Steven T. Mnuchin. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. Defendants' motions for summary judgment are granted, and Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending in 19 Civ. 6642 (Dkt. Nos. 57, 59) and in 19 Civ. 6654 (Dkt. Nos. 44, 46), to enter judgment for Defendants in both cases, and to close both cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/30/2024) (tg) |