WELLS v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-15570 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2020 3:41 AM EST |
Defendant
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
|
Defendant
MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
PFIZER, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
|
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN WELLS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 10 2023
MDL OPINION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANT ONLY pursuant to CMO No. 60. [PFIZER, INC. terminated]. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/24/2023. (ams, ) |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (ROSE, BETH) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 05/10 3:14 PM
MDL OPINION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANT ONLY pursuant to CMO No. 60. [PFIZER, INC. terminated]. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/24/2023. (ams, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/12 3:42 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by PFIZER, INC..(INSOGNA, KATHERINE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/10 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 06/27 4:21 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by KAREN WELLS.(BAILEY, K. CAMP) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/31 1:20 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PFIZER, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Fri 05/27 3:18 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by KAREN WELLS as to PFIZER, INC.. (COWAN, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, February 23, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/23 2:08 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (sbg, ) |
||
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
26
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/22 8:49 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs enumerated on the attached Exhibit A are hereby ordered to show cause within thirty (30) days as follows (1) establish that service was effected on Pfizer as required by Rule 4(m) by filing proof of service, (2) voluntarily dismiss Pfizer, or (3) show cause why Pfizer should not be dismissed. (Special Master Order). Signed by Ellen Reisman, Special Master on 11/19/2021. (jl, ) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 10:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) |
|
order
Case Management Order
Fri 07/19 10:59 AM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (lag, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Fri 07/19 10:59 AM
Member Case Direct File on 7/18/19, for MDL 17-2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (lag, ) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9827441) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KAREN WELLS.(BAILEY, K. CAMP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |