Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.71.24.245
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia S Krieger |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-02097 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 17, 2020 1:29 AM MST |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.71.24.245
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report re: Copyright
Tue 10/08 7:52 AM
Report re Copyright: Report on the determination of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (sphil, ) |
|
12 | 12
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Tue 10/08 7:48 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Fri 10/04 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Wed 08/07 9:36 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/7/2019.(tsher, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memorandum
Tue 08/06 8:07 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding8 MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/6/2019. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave
Mon 08/05 7:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C Declarations in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minute Order
Mon 07/22 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Marcia S. Krieger. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/22/2019. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/22 11:50 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge who is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2; (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause; (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions; (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding; and (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/22/2019. Text Only Entry (msklc4) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Mon 07/22 9:24 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) |
|
Sunday, July 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 07/22 9:23 AM
Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report re: Copyright
Mon 07/22 9:11 AM
Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sun 07/21 6:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 07/21 6:20 PM
COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 75.71.24.245 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6800810)Attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |