Pittard et al v. H.E. Sheik Khalid Bin Hamad Bin Khalifa Al Thani et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:19-cv-01784 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 18, 2020 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Geo Strategic Defense Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant
H.E. Sheik Khalid Bin Hamad Bin Khalif Al Thani
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KH Holding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Al Anabi Racing USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Allende
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Pittard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order dismissing case
Wed 01/29 2:14 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and "Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Complaint as to All Defendants" (Doc. ## 27 and 28 ), this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/29/2020. (ANL) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Thu 01/23 10:37 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Matthew Pittard (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Thu 01/23 10:36 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Matthew Allende (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 01/17 11:55 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The "Partially Opposed Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss" (Doc. # 25 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiffs may file their responses on or before January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/17/2020. (ANL) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/16 10:37 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs.(Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
21
pgs
motion
Dismiss/lack of jurisdiction
Thu 01/02 8:35 PM
MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and insufficient service of process by H.E. Sheik Khalid Bin Hamad Bin Khalif Al Thani.(Soto, Alejandro) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 01/02 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Armando Rosquete on behalf of Al Anabi Racing USA, LLC (Rosquete, Armando) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/02 6:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Al Anabi Racing USA, LLC.(Rosquete, Armando) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Don Greenbaum | ||
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons issued
Thu 11/07 12:04 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Al Anabi Racing USA, LLC. (JNB) |
|
20 | 20
service
Proposed summons
Thu 11/07 10:39 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Matthew Pittard. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
19 | 19
service
Proposed summons
Thu 11/07 10:38 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Matthew Allende. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/05 10:22 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Matthew Pittard.(Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/05 10:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Matthew Allende.(Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 11/04 5:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. # 14 ). Because no responsive pleading has been filed, Plaintiffs may amend their complaint at this time as a matter of course. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). For docketing purposes, Plaintiffs are directed to file their amended complaint as a separate filing. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/4/2019. (ANL) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/04 4:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting motion to extend time to effectuate service (Doc. ## 12 , 13 ) through and including January 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/4/2019. (ANL) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 10/28 2:10 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT AND TO ADDITIONAL LEGAL NAMES OF DEFENDANT KHALID by All Plaintiffs.(Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/25 2:02 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS H.E. SHEIKH KHALID BIN HAMAD BIN KHALIFA AL THANI AND GEO STRATEGIC DEFENSE SOLUTIONS, LLC by Matthew Pittard. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/25 2:01 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS H.E. SHEIKH KHALID BIN HAMAD BIN KHALIFA AL THANI AND GEO STRATEGIC DEFENSE SOLUTIONS, LLC by Matthew Allende. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/18 1:34 PM
NOTICE by Matthew Pittard NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/18 1:33 PM
NOTICE by Matthew Allende NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of service
Tue 09/03 11:54 AM
RETURN of service executed on 8/27/19 KH Holding, LLC by Matthew Pittard (Castaneda, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (JNB) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of service
Tue 09/03 11:52 AM
RETURN of service executed on 8/27/19 as to KH Holding, LLC by Matthew Allende (Castaneda, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (JNB) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
service
Summons issued
Thu 07/25 11:06 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Geo Strategic Defense Solutions, LLC, H.E. Sheik Khalid Bin Hamad Bin Khalif Al Thani, KH Holding, LLC. (JNB) |
|
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Thu 07/25 9:32 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 7/25/2019. (SRC) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proposed summons
Wed 07/24 4:23 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Matthew Pittard. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed summons
Wed 07/24 4:22 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Matthew Pittard. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed summons
Wed 07/24 4:21 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Matthew Pittard. (Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/23 11:57 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1784-T-60AAS. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15717359) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Castaneda, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Fair Labor Standards Act Consent Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Fair Labor Standards Act Consent Form |