Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Carmen C Cerezo |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-01172 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 11:32 PM AST |
Defendant
Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DD IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
130 Royall St.
Canton, MA 02021 |
|
Plaintiff
Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment
Mon 04/25 9:22 PM
JUDGMENT - DISMISSING this action, with prejudice and without the imposition of costs or attorney's fees. Motion terminated:36 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/22/2016. (mld) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/26 4:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC. (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 02/05 9:49 AM
ORDER - Proceedings in this action are STAYED and all pending16 20 21 22 23 25 28 29 32 motions are deemed MOOT. Related document: Memorandum & Order by USDC of Massachusetts in Civil No. 14-10162 NMG) at docket entry 33-1. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 2/4/2015. (mld) |
|
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE of Intent to File Appeal from Order in Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants, LLC et al. v. Wometco Donas, Inc., et al. Case No. 14-cv-10162-NMG (D. Mass) by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) | |
33 | 33 NOTICE Regarding Ruling in Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants, LLC et al. v. Wometco Donas, Inc., et al. Case No. 14-cv-10162-NMG (D. Mass) Enjoining Plaintiff From Prosecuting This Case by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (Worthen, David) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum & Order | ||
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
32 | 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Barbara M. Sabat-Lafontaine on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/14/2014 (Sabat-Lafontaine, Barbara) Modified on 6/30/2014 as to title (ni). | |
Monday, June 16, 2014 | ||
31 | 31 6 pgs Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Re:29 MOTION for Leave to File Document Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Reply In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction To Enjoin Arbitration Against Wometco PR filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC. (Worthen, David) | |
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariadna Alvarez on behalf of Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. (Alvarez, Ariadna) | |
Friday, May 30, 2014 | ||
29 | 29 MOTION for Leave to File Document Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Reply In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction To Enjoin Arbitration Against Wometco PR filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2014(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding the Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by David E. Worthen on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/16/2014(Worthen, David) Modified on 6/4/2014 to correct response deadline (ni). | |
Att: 1 Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Memorandum - Hearing Transcript on Motion for Preliminary Injunction | ||
Tuesday, May 27, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 Minutes of Proceedings before Judge Carmen C. Cerezo: granted retroactively17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to16 Motion to Dismiss. (mld) | |
Friday, May 23, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 25 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Re:22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction To Enjoin Defendants Dunkin Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC And DD IP Holder, LLC From Arbitrating Against Wometco PR filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC.(Worthen, David) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - May 22, 2014 letter | ||
25 | 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by David E. Worthen on behalf of DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/9/2014 (Worthen, David) | |
Wednesday, May 21, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to16 MOTION to Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc.(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) Modified on 5/22/2014 as to title/dkt text (mr). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
23 | 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/6/2014 (Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) | |
Wednesday, May 07, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction To Enjoin Defendants Dunkin Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC And DD IP Holder, LLC From Arbitrating Against Wometco PR filed by Jesus E. Cuza-Abdala on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/23/2014(Cuza-Abdala, Jesus) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, May 02, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 MOTION to Stay the Filing of an Answer filed by Barbara M. Sabat-Lafontaine on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2014 (Sabat-Lafontaine, Barbara) | |
Wednesday, April 30, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Ina M. Berlingeri-Vincenty filed by Ina M. Berlingeri-Vincenty on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/16/2014 (Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
Monday, April 21, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 Minutes of Proceedings before Judge Carmen C. Cerezo: granted13 14 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice by attorneys Iris Figueroa-Rosario and David E. Worthen. (mld) | |
18 | 18 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/4/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2015 04:45 PM in CC's Chambers before Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. Discovery due by 11/28/2014. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/21/14.(gsr) | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 21, 2014 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC filed by Ina M. Berlingeri-Vincenty on behalf of Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2014 (Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
Thursday, April 03, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc.( Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2014) filed by Barbara M. Sabat-Lafontaine on behalf of Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC(Sabat-Lafontaine, Barbara) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1.A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1.B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1.C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1.D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 1.E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 1.F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1.G, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement byBaskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC. (Sabat-Lafontaine, Barbara) | |
14 | 14 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number 0104-3865455) filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2014 (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos) | |
13 | 13 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number 0104-3865431) filed by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2014 (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos) | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara M. Sabat-Lafontaine on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (Sabat-Lafontaine, Barbara) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos) | |
Wednesday, April 02, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Minutes of Proceedings before Judge Carmen C. Cerezo: granted9 Motion to Appear PHV by attorney Monica Vila. (mld) | |
Thursday, March 20, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. upon DD IP Holder LLC served on 3/13/2014, answer due 4/3/2014. (Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. upon Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC served on 3/13/2014, answer due 4/3/2014. (Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. upon Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC served on 3/13/2014, answer due 4/3/2014. (Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
Wednesday, March 19, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Motion to allow Monica Vila to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number PRX100025331) filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2014(ni) | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, March 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC (jla) | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to DD IP Holder LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC (jla) | |
Friday, March 07, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc..(Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (rc) | |
Wednesday, March 05, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-3821395.), filed by Wometco de Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 7/7/2014,(Berlingeri-Vincenty, Ina) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |