Bick v. Utah State University et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | David Barlow |
Referred: | Daphne A Oberg |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00084 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2020 2:10 AM MST |
Defendant
Carolyn Barcus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Blume
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tamara Ellington
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gretchen Peacock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Melissa Tehee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Utah State University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Bick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
99 | 99
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 01/25 2:28 PM
ORDER granting 98 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/25/2022. (jl) |
|
98 | 98
motion
Dismiss
Tue 01/25 1:32 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Matthew Bick.(Barney, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/25 2:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated per99 . Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case. (jl) |