Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-36300

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 4:19-bk-36299
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Barneys, Inc.
240 Hudson Valley District Suite 240
Central Valley, NY 10917
Represented By
Joshua Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 11A Clinton Ave. Room 620
Albany, NY 12207


1. Luxury retailer Barneys files for bankruptcy protection (aol.com)
Submitted Wed 08/07/2019
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Friday, August 16, 2019
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 6:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Karol K. Denniston on behalf of Littler Mendelson P.C.. (Denniston, Karol)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
5 5 misc Transcript Tue 11:40 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/06/19 At 3:51 PM RE: Doc #2 Motion For Joint Administration Filed By Joshua Sussberg On Behalf Of Barneys, Inc.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/6/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/15/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/9/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/6/2019. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
4 4 order Motion, Joint Administration Wed 8:24 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] signed on 8/7/2019. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Wed 9:21 AM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Barneys New York, Inc. Case No. 19-36300 (CGM); Barneys, Inc. Case No. 19-36299 (CGM); BNY Catering, Inc. Case No. 19-36301 (CGM); BNY Licensing Corp. Case No. 19-36302 (CGM); and Barneys Asia Co. LLC Case No. 19-36303 (CGM). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, Case No. 19-36300 (Fredericks, Frances)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven E. Fox on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Fox, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Tue 1:52 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Barneys, Inc.. (Sussberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 1:00 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Joshua Sussberg of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of Barneys, Inc.. (Sussberg, Joshua)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 1:22 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-36299 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13353183. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Tue 10:35 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 8/20/2019. Schedule D due 8/20/2019. Schedule E/F due 8/20/2019. Schedule G due 8/20/2019. Schedule H due 8/20/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/20/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/20/2019. Atty Disclosure State. due 8/20/2019. Declaration of Schedules due 8/20/2019. Corporate Resolution due 8/20/2019. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 8/20/2019. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Tue 5:08 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated Re: Motion for Joint Administration filed by Joshua Sussberg; Hearing held, Motion Granted, Submit Order as indicated on the record. (Fredericks, Frances)
Related: [-]