Williams et al v. The City of Syracuse et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-00995 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 08, 2020 3:17 AM EST |
Defendant
Gregory DiPuccio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Syracuse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Police Officer Liadka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Chrysler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Williams
|
Represented By
|
1. | Two Syracuse Police officers named in federal civil rights lawsuit (cnycentral.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/16/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 04/19 3:58 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2024 via video before Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes re66 Motion for Summary Judgment: After questioning counsel and allowing supplemental argument, the court is inclined to deny the motion. A written order will be issued. The court briefly discusses trial deadlines and inquires as to any settlement prospects. Plaintiffs shall submit a settlement demand to defense counsel by 4/30/2024. Defense counsel is directed to file a status report by 5/8/2024 advise whether a settlement conference would be productive. The court is inclined to hold the final pretrial conference via video. Appearances: Fred Lichtmacher, Esq. for plaintiffs; Danielle Pires, Esq. for defendants. (Court Reporter: Hannah Cavanaugh. Time: 2:00 p.m. - 2:21 p.m.) (nmk) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
75 | 75
order
Order on Letter Request
Wed 04/17 10:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: granting74 Letter requesting to appear virtually on April 19. The oral argument set for 4/19/2024 will proceed via video conference. The clerk will provide a Microsoft Teams link to counsel. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/17/2024. (nmk) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Tue 04/16 1:20 PM
Letter Motion from Fred Lichtmacher for Rachel Chrysler, Kyle Williams requesting I be allowed to appear virtually on April 19 submitted to Judge Sannes . (Lichtmacher, Fred) |