Hanover County Unit of the NAACP v. County School Board of Hanover County
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Payne |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00599 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2020 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant
County School Board of Hanover County
7516 County Complex Road P.O. Box 470
Hanover, VA 23069 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hanover County Unit of the NAACP
311 Berkley Street
Ashland, VA 23005 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hanover County
Terminated: 10/29/2019
7516 County Complex Road P.O. Box 470
Hanover, VA 23069 |
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit challenges schools named after Confederate leaders (13newsnow.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/19/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
82 | 82
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 10/19 9:20 AM
USCA Mandate re79 Notice of Appeal : This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lbre, ) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
81 | 81
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 10/19 9:19 AM
ORDER of USCA as to79 Notice of Appeal filed by Hanover County Unit of the NAACP : Upon consideration of the stipulated motion to voluntarily dismiss, the court dismisses this appeal, upon such terms as have been agreed to by the parties, pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lbre, ) |