Mr. T. v. Leafly Holdings, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-07286 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2020 12:31 AM PST |
Defendant
Leafly Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Mr. T.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Fri 04/17 4:54 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal | ||
28 | 28
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 04/17 4:47 PM
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case27 . Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. The Court will retain jurisdiction over this matter for purposes of interpreting and enforcing the parties' confidential settlement agreement, if necessary. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/16 5:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The reason is the case settled. [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice] filed by Plaintiff Mr. T..(Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/15 9:35 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The SCHEDULING CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 04/15/2020 is CONTINUED to 5/21/2020 at 08:30 AM. Counsel are to file a joint status report by noon on 05/19/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/10 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND CONTINUE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case24 . (Scheduling Conference continued to 4/15/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) |
|
24 | 24
stip
Stay Case
Fri 02/07 12:26 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc..(Goldmark, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 02/03 2:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [Joint Rule 26(f) Status Report] ; estimated length of trial three (3) days, filed by Plaintiff Mr. T... (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/06 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for February 13, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded oftheir obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than February 3, 2020. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 12/18 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc., (Goldmark, John) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 12/18 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc..(Goldmark, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 11/20 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL18 COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' request to extend the deadline for Defendant LEAFLY HOLDING INC.'s to response to the Complaint by an additional 30 days, until December 18, 2019. (hr) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 11/18 5:59 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Leafly Holdings, Inc. answer now due 12/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc..(Goldmark, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 10/18 2:28 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Leafly Holdings, Inc. answer now due 11/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc..(Goldmark, John) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/16 9:37 AM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John Goldmark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc, designating Nicole S. Phillis as local counsel14 . (iv) |
|
15 | 15
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/15 12:57 PM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting13 Non-Resident Attorney Nathan W. Rouse APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Leafly Holdings, Inc., Defendant, designating Nicole S. Phillis as local counsel. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 10/09 3:56 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Goldmark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24583896) filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc.. (Phillis, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 10/09 3:39 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan W. Rouse to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24583672) filed by Defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Nicole Phillis added to party Leafly Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Phillis, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/04 1:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Mr. T.. upon Leafly Holdings, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John Goldmark, Esq., Attorney. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 11:34 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Mon 08/26 10:15 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mr. T.. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Fri 08/23 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/23 2:53 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Leafly Holdings, Inc. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 08/23 2:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 08/23 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 08/22 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Mr. T.. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/22 11:07 AM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mr. T., identifying Mr. T and Leafly Holdings, Inc.. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Thu 08/22 10:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Mr. T.. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 08/22 10:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mr. T.. (Cislo, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/22 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24305326 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mr. T.. (Attorney Daniel Miles Cislo added to party Mr. T. (pty:pla))(Cislo, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5 |