Crown Sterling Limited LLC v. UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-07900 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2020 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant
UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA
2 Penn Plaza
NEW YORK, NY 10121 |
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Crown Sterling Limited LLC
4040 MacArthur Blvd
Newport Beach, CA 92660 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 05/12 4:11 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Complaint in this action was filed on August 22, 2019 [ECF #1]. At no point has any proof of service been filed on the docket. On May 8, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice, listing only o Defendant UBM LLC [ECF # 15]. There has been no activity in this case to name or to serve Defendants DOES 1-10. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal against Defendant UBM LLC [ECF # 15] is GRANTED. It is further: ORDERED that suit against the remaining Defendants, Does 1-10, is discontinued for failure to prosecute without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Courts calendar provided any such application to restore the action is made by June 11, 2020. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with respect to all defendants and with prejudice. See LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001) (citing Link v. Wabash R.R. Co., 370 U.S. 626, 630 (1962)). (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/12/2020) (mro) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 05/08 12:29 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 05/08 3:39 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 15 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp) |
||
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/13 11:19 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA answer due 4/19/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/13/20) (yv) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/12 10:22 AM
FOURTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from JOSHUA R. BRESSLER dated March 12, 2020. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC..(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 02/26 3:51 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA answer due 3/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/26/20) (yv) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 02/11 10:14 AM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from JOSHUA R. BRESSLER dated FEBRUARY 11, 2020. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC..(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 02/11 7:56 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Deborah A. Batts is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 01/17 2:44 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Crown Sterling Limited LLC answer due 2/19/2020.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 1/17/2020) (rro) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 01/10 4:09 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from JOSHUA R BRESSLER dated JANUARY 10, 2020. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC.(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/03 11:19 AM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA answer due 1/20/2020.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/3/2019) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 11/27 7:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from JOSHUA R. BRESSLER dated November 27, 2019. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC.(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/06 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC.(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Black Hat Code of Conduct, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Black Hat Agreement | ||
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/23 1:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA. (dnh) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/23 12:09 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC.(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 08/23 12:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bressler, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 08/23 1:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Ron Bressler to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 08/23 1:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Ron Bressler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 08/23 1:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Ron Bressler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 08/23 1:47 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 08/23 1:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 08/23 1:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 08/23 12:04 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UBM LLC a/k/a Black Hat USA, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC. (Bressler, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/22 11:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Crown Sterling Limited LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17480185)Document filed by Crown Sterling Limited LLC.(Bressler, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Black Hat Code of Conduct, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Black Hat Agreement |