Merck & Co., Inc., et al v. HHS, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01738
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cvus-05222 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 17, 2020 4:29 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
AARP
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
AARP Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Cato Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
NCTA - The Internet & Television Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
National Association of Broadcasters
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Washington Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Goldwater Institute
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Alex Michael Azar, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Seema Verma, in her official capacity as the Administrator of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Association of National Advertisers Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Merck & Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Association of National Advertisers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Amgen Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Eli Lilly and Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/17/2020 4:29 AM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 19-5222 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1803244] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01738-APM filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, HHS and Seema Verma. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5222 19-5222 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1803252] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/23/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/07/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/23/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/23/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/23/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/07/2019 19-5222 |