Make the Road New York et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:19-cv-07777
Lead case: 1:19-cv-07777
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George B Daniels |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-07993 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2020 4:32 AM EST |
Amicus
PHI
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Health Law Advocates et al.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Justice in Aging
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Congressional Tri-Caucus
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MAZON
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.;
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Caring Across Generations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Council on Aging
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Society on Aging
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Public Health Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
National Hispanic Council on Aging
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Academy of Nursing
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
New York State American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American College of Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ken Cuccinelli
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin K. McAleenan
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mental Health America
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Oasis Legal Services
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kids Forward
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Little Lobbyists
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
New York Civil Liberties Union
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Center for Law and Economic Justice
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Council on Independent Living
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Disability Rights Network
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Federation of the Blind
200 East Wells Street
Baltimore, MD 21230 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Economic Progress Institute
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Spinal Association
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Arc of United States
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Association of People with Disabilities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Civil Liberties Union
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Asian Americans Advancing Justice/Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund/National Women's Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Association of University Centers on Disabilities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Autistic Self Advocacy Network
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Boundless Immigration
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
California Immigrant Policy Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Center for Public Representation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Child Care Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Community Action Marin
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Disability Rights Advocates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Disability Rights New York
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fiscal Policy Institute
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Asian American Federation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Make the Road New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
African Services Committee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
369 | 369
39
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/12 9:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:361 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Ur jaddou..(Kolsky, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Order from HomeAway.com v. NY), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (IRS Form 990) | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
368 | 368
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 04/10 11:58 AM
ORDER granting in part367 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED in part. Defendants may file a brief with five (5) additional pages. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/10/2024) (rro) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
367 | 367
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 04/09 8:54 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Joshua Kolsky dated April 9, 2024. Document filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Kolsky, Joshua) |