INTER CITY RETREAD, INC. v. MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jose L Linares |
Referred: | Joseph A Dickson |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01564 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 9:36 PM EST |
Defendant
MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV PETER W. HERZOG, III
|
|
Plaintiff
INTER CITY RETREAD, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 08, 2014 | ||
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of South Carolinaas case 6:14-cv-01254, filed 04/07/2014. (mfr) | ||
Monday, April 07, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter W. Herzog III, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FENNELLY, KATHLEEN) | |
Case extracted via ECF to District of South Carolina. (mfr) | ||
Friday, April 04, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 OPINION/ORDER granting3 Motion to Transfer Case to USDC for the DIST. OF SO. CAROLINA - GREENVILLE DIVISION; that Plaintiffs application for the issuance of temporary restraints enjoining Defendant from terminating Plaintiff as franchisee is granted.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/4/14. (DD, ) | |
Pro Hac Vice fee as to PETER W. HERZOG, ESQ: $ 150, receipt number NEW019722 (DD, ) | ||
Thursday, April 03, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Peter W. Herzog, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/2/14. (sr, ) | |
Wednesday, April 02, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Letter from Thomas R. Curtin, Esq. Responding to Plaintiff's 4-2-14 Request for Entry of a TRO. (CURTIN, THOMAS) | |
12 | 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraints by INTER CITY RETREAD, INC..(LASALA, JOSEPH) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC., filed by INTER CITY RETREAD, INC..(LASALA, JOSEPH) | |
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of South Carolina (CURTIN, THOMAS) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, March 30, 2014 | ||
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) | ||
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(FENNELLY, KATHLEEN) | |
Att: 1 Certification of Kathleen N. Fennelly, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Peter W. Herzog III, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) | ||
Thursday, March 27, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by INTER CITY RETREAD, INC..(LASALA, JOSEPH) | |
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN M. FENNELLY on behalf of MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (FENNELLY, KATHLEEN) | |
Monday, March 24, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 BRIEF in Opposition filed by INTER CITY RETREAD, INC. re3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of South Carolina (LASALA, JOSEPH) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 18, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM F. O'CONNOR, JR on behalf of INTER CITY RETREAD, INC.(O'CONNOR, WILLIAM) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH P. LASALA on behalf of INTER CITY RETREAD, INC.(LASALA, JOSEPH) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, March 14, 2014 | ||
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of South Carolina . Motion set for 4/7/2014 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) | ||
Thursday, March 13, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of South Carolina by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(CURTIN, THOMAS) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 11, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. identifying MICHELIN CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (dr, ) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC. from Superior Court of Union County, case number UNN-C-0105-13. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5555982), filed by MICHELIN RETREAD TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(dr, ) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service |