1 Global Capital LLC v. GTW Construction, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:18-bk-19121
Lead BK case is: 0:18-bk-19121
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Raymond B Ray |
Case #: | 0:19-ap-01395 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GTW Construction, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travis Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
1 Global Capital LLC
283 Catalonia Ave # 200
Miami, FL 33134 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 12/20 8:58 PM
Adversary Case 0:19-ap-1395 Closed. (Cervino, Maria) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/22 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC . (Feldman, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismiss Party Order
Wed 11/20 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Party Travis Wilson (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Party
Tue 11/19 1:54 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Defendant Travis Wilson Filed by Plaintiff 1 Global Capital LLC (Feldman, Jonathan) |
|
Saturday, October 26, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 10/27 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/26/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
14
pgs
order
Order Setting Pre-Trial/Trial
Thu 10/24 11:18 AM
Amended Omnibus Order ReSetting Pre-Trial Conference . Pretrial Conference set for 03/11/2020 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 4 (RAM), Miami, FL 33128. (Lebron, Lorraine) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
15
pgs
court
Order of Recusal and Notice of Case Reassignment (SMG to RAM)
Mon 10/07 2:03 PM
Order of Recusal. Pursuant to Clerks Notice of Reassignment (see 18-19121 ECF #1390) this proceeding is transferred from Judge Scott M. Grossman to Judge Robert A. Mark. (Cervino, Maria) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Mon 10/07 9:56 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 28 Days Before Pretrial Date. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 10/07 9:56 AM
Summons Issued on GTW Construction, LLC Answer Due 11/6/2019; Travis Wilson Answer Due 11/6/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Case Reassignment (RBR to SMG)
Wed 10/02 8:37 PM
In accordance with[LINK:General Order 2019-03] , this case is transferred from Judge Raymond B. Ray to Judge Scott M. Grossman. (Cervino, Maria) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/27 11:29 PM
Adversary case 19-01395 Complaint by 1 Global Capital LLC against GTW Construction, LLC, Travis Wilson. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Feldman, Jonathan) |