Barnes et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jean C Hamilton |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00460 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 11:37 AM CST |
Defendant
Boston Scientific Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janie Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Porter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Ploplys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberta Paul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Meeker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lois Measimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esther McKinnon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winnie Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Pulda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherry Matney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Machamer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Lyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justina Lucero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Lozano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Love
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannie Liles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nichole Klein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Killen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paulette Seabrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myra Zibner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Wineland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Birdie Whyde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helen Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Vondran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Effie Tyre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dixie Swisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Shepard-Bragg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Huerta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Schoolman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darcy Scheidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsie Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Ruhland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Rohloff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Radney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Quinnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Quinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minnie Booker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann DeChambeau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raquel D'Andelet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Cormier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Corea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Chomilo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Casas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flozell Carlton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susie Carlisle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margo Breault
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Driskell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobbie Blackwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Blackmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Aycock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Austreng
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Anstiss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris Adcock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annette Furgerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith Huelsnitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Hoghaug
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laurie Hochheimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Halbe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Grubbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie Griego
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eleanor Frances Gregg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florie Gishie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Gibbons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Gaines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delores Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Funk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winnie Flynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Fitch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Felton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norma Encarnacion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynae Eliason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Dyott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juana Duran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicolaza Duarte
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of West Virginia. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) | |
***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Southern District of West Virginia as case 2:14-cv-13537, filed 03/31/2014. (DLB) | ||
Thursday, March 27, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 102) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Jeffery N. Lüthi, Clerk of the Panel on 03/27/2014. (CLK) | |
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs .(Schwartz, Thomas) Modified on 3/27/2014 (CEL). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, March 20, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL filed by Plaintiffs Doris Adcock, Brenda Allen, Betty Anstiss, Patricia Austreng, Betty Aycock, Judy Ball, Tina Barnes, Tammy Bennett, Dorothy Blackmon, Bobbie Blackwell, Minnie Booker, Margo Breault, Susie Carlisle, Flozell Carlton, Judy Casas, Wanda Chomilo, Rose Clark, Brenda Corea, Rosa Cormier, Raquel D'Andelet, Ann DeChambeau, Carmen Delgado, Deborah Driskell, Nicolaza Duarte, Juana Duran, Mary Dyott, Lynae Eliason, Norma Encarnacion, Sharon Felton, Judith Fitch, Kathy Floyd, Winnie Flynn, Leslie Funk, Annette Furgerson, Jackie Gaines, Kathy Gibbons, Florie Gishie, Eleanor Frances Gregg, Valerie Griego, Patricia Grubbs, Patricia Halbe, Rhonda Haynes, Laurie Hochheimer, Judy Hoghaug, Edith Huelsnitz, Elsa Huerta, Delores Johnson, Winnie Johnson, Laura Killen, Nichole Klein, Jeannie Liles, Felicia Love, Darlene Lozano, Justina Lucero, Donna Lyon, Deborah Machamer, Sherry Matney, Janie Mays, Esther McKinnon, Lois Measimer, Debra Meeker, Kimberly Montgomery, Kathleen Moore, Maria Morales, Mary Moreno, Katherine Nelson, Roberta Paul, Linda Ploplys, Deanna Porter, Shirley Pulda, Debra Quinn, Barbara Quinnell, Nancy Radney, Brandy Rohloff, Judy Ruhland, Elsie Sanchez, Gina Sanchez, Joanna Sanchez, Darcy Scheidt, Nancy Schoolman, Paulette Seabrook, Kimberly Shepard-Bragg, Dawn Smith, Lisa Smith, Dixie Swisher, Effie Tyre, Linda Vondran, Helen Watkins, Birdie Whyde, Betty Wilson, Connie Wineland, Myra Zibner.(Schwartz, Thomas) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, March 19, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 17 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Rankin, W.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Barnes Short Form Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Meeker Short Form Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Hammond | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rankin, W.) | |
Monday, March 17, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed(Noce, Gerard) | |
Att: 1 Attachment Email from St. Louis City Circuit Court | ||
Thursday, March 13, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation of Supplemental Authority(Rankin, W.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order granting stay | ||
8 | 8 Petition STATE PETITION. Received From: the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, filed by Elsie Sanchez, Norma Encarnacion, Birdie Whyde, Brenda Corea, Judy Ball, Jeannie Liles, Lois Measimer, Nancy Radney, Ann DeChambeau, Nicolaza Duarte, Annette Furgerson, Deborah Machamer, Debra Meeker, Joanna Sanchez, Laura Killen, Delores Johnson, Edith Huelsnitz, Sharon Felton, Laurie Hochheimer, Judy Hoghaug, Judith Fitch, Janie Mays, Maria Morales, Brandy Rohloff, Linda Vondran, Kathy Floyd, Dorothy Blackmon, Carmen Delgado, Barbara Quinnell, Kimberly Shepard-Bragg, Donna Lyon, Helen Watkins, Bobbie Blackwell, Leslie Funk, Kathleen Moore, Eleanor Frances Gregg, Lisa Smith, Mary Moreno, Rosa Cormier, Nancy Schoolman, Nichole Klein, Judy Casas, Mary Dyott, Juana Duran, Roberta Paul, Rhonda Haynes, Wanda Chomilo, Darlene Lozano, Winnie Johnson, Kathy Gibbons, Deborah Driskell, Deanna Porter, Felicia Love, Linda Ploplys, Tammy Bennett, Shirley Pulda, Valerie Griego, Tina Barnes, Debra Quinn, Effie Tyre, Patricia Austreng, Esther McKinnon, Judy Ruhland, Rose Clark, Lynae Eliason, Elsa Huerta, Florie Gishie, Dawn Smith, Susie Carlisle, Patricia Halbe, Jackie Gaines, Kimberly Montgomery, Patricia Grubbs, Dixie Swisher, Gina Sanchez, Sherry Matney, Winnie Flynn, Justina Lucero, Flozell Carlton, Paulette Seabrook, Katherine Nelson, Margo Breault, Betty Wilson, Brenda Allen, Minnie Booker, Darcy Scheidt, Betty Aycock, Betty Anstiss, Myra Zibner, Raquel D'Andelet, Connie Wineland, Doris Adcock.(DLT). | |
7 | 7 6 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re6 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Rankin, W.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to MDL by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rankin, W.) | |
5 | 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bauer, Beth) | |
4 | 4 ENTRY of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rankin, W.) | |
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (DLT) | ||
Wednesday, March 12, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.. (Noce, Gerard) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Noce, Gerard) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1422-CC00329, with receipt number 0865-4231774, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Noce, Gerard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/13/2014) (DLT). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-State Court File, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-Pierson J Pretrial Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C-8th Circuit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-Atwell Transcript, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E-Atwell Order, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F-Witherspoon, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G-Welsh, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H-Keune, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I-Short Form Complaints, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J-Memo, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L-Hyatt, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M-Boschert |