Knights v. Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Todd J Campbell |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00720 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 10, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 12:29 PM CST |
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erin Knights
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tresca Prater
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
72 | 72 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/12/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) | |
71 | 71 ORDER: In light of a clerical error, the Order entered at Docket No. 70 is hereby vacated. The correct Order will be entered contemporaneously herewith. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/12/2014. (eh) | |
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
70 | 70 ***VACATED*** Per Order DE# 71-FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) Modified on 11/12/2014 (eh). | |
69 | 69 ORDER: Based on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class Representative Service Payments and papers filed in support thereof, and good cause shown therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following amounts are APPROVED to be paid from the Settlement Fund. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/10/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh) | |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Todd J. Campbell: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2014 re61 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Erin Knights, Tresca Prater. Motion granted. Order to enter (Court Reporter Peggy Turner.)(Bush, Doris) | ||
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
68 | 68 NOTICE of Filing by Erin Knights, Tresca Prater re61 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval [Final] of Revised Proposed Final Approval Order(Drake, E.) | |
Att: 1 Attachment Revised Proposed Final Approval Order | ||
67 | 67 DECLARATION of E. Michelle Drake filed by Erin Knights, Tresca Prater re:61 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval [Final] .(Drake, E.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 - Opt Out Received 10/30/14 |