Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Referred: Jodi F Jayne
Case #: 4:19-cv-00484
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1362 ERISA
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2019
Terminated:Apr 10, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 01, 2020 2:31 AM CST
Defendant
Kurt Cofano
Defendant
Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Local 798 Training Center
Represented By
Louis L Robein, Jr
Robein Urann Spencer Picard & Cangemi
contact info
William Brant Warrick
Holloway Monaghan King
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan
Represented By
Louis L Robein, Jr
Robein Urann Spencer Picard & Cangemi
contact info
William Brant Warrick
Holloway Monaghan King
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund
Represented By
Louis L Robein, Jr
Robein Urann Spencer Picard & Cangemi
contact info
William Brant Warrick
Holloway Monaghan King
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeline Industry Pension Fund
Represented By
Louis L Robein, Jr
Robein Urann Spencer Picard & Cangemi
contact info
William Brant Warrick
Holloway Monaghan King
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeliners Local Union No. 798
Represented By
Louis L Robein, Jr
Robein Urann Spencer Picard & Cangemi
contact info
William Brant Warrick
Holloway Monaghan King
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/23/2021 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
23 23 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Tue 04/14 10:40 AM
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/14 9:08 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service Related [+] by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (Warrick, William)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment, Entering Default Judgment, Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, April 10, 2020
21 21 order 03 - Judgment Judgment Entered (Default) Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 04/10 10:59 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; entering default judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against All Defendants (terminates case) ; granting19 Motion for Default Judgment (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Fri 04/10 12:06 PM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number21 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Thu 03/05 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to provide, for use by the Court, a three-ring binder notebook containing a paper copy of the document as filed at Doc. 19, with each exhibit under its respective numbered tab. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the document after filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
Related: [-] 19 MOTION for Default Judgment against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano
19 19 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/05 11:09 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
18 18 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 01/06 11:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying17 Motion for Default Judgment (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2019
17 17 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/06 3:43 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
16 16 order 11 - Clerks Entry of Default Ruling on Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 10/10 10:02 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting15 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
15 15 motion Entry of Default by Clerk Wed 10/09 9:41 AM
Amended MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
14 14 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk Tue 10/08 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk that competency statement regarding Kurt Cofano is not included ; denying13 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
13 13 motion Entry of Default by Clerk Mon 10/07 4:11 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/12 5:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kurt Cofano Served September 9, 2019 Related [+] by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint,
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/12 5:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cofano Energy Services, LLC Related [+] by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint,
Thursday, September 05, 2019
10 10 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 8:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Pipeline Industry Pension Fund; Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund; Pipeline Industry Annuity 401 (k) Plan; Local 798 Training Center; Pipelines Local Union No. 798 to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 09/04 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kurt Cofano, Cofano Energy Services, LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/4/2019 to correct file date (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 09/03 2:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Local 798 Training Center (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 09/03 2:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 09/03 2:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 09/03 2:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 09/03 2:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 09/03 1:49 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Brant Warrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2103641) by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/03 1:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 [Note: Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Local 798 Training Center(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeliners Local Union No. 798(pty:pla).] (Warrick, William)
Related: [-]