Reproductive Health Svcs, et al v. Parson, et al
Original Case: 2:19-cv-04155
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-02882 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 29, 2021 3:22 PM CDT |
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Americans United for Life
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Alaska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Arkansas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Idaho
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Kansas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Alliance Defending Freedom
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Montana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of South Dakota
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of North Dakota
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
State of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of New Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Rhode Island
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Vermont
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Maine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Hawaii
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Constitutional Law Scholars
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American Federation of Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Physician Women for Democratic Principals
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Service Employees' International Union
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Shout Your Abortion
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Reproductive Justice Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American Academy of Family Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American College of Physicians
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American College of Osteopathic Obstetricians and Gynecologists
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Society for Maternal- Fetal Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology
|
Represented By
|
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
American Society for Reproductive Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly Gardner, in her official capacity as the Circuit Attorney for the City of St. Louis
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Michael L. Parson, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Eric S. Schmitt, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MD Marc K. Taormina, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MD Jade D. James, in her official capacity as President of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PhD, MPP, MPH Sarah Martin, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Missouri Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MD Sammy L. Alexander, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DO James A. DiRenna, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jeffrey S. Glaser, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Katherine J. Matthews, in her official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MD Naveed Razzaque, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DO David E. Tannehill, in his official capacity as a Member of the Missouri State Board of Registration for the Healing Arts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MD Randall Williams, in his official capacity as Director of the Department of Health & Senior Services of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Eric Stephen Schmitt, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc., on behalf of itself, its physicians, its staff, and its patients
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DO, MSCI, FACOG Colleen P. McNicholas, on behalf of herself and her patients
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 09 2021
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Jane Kelly, Roger L. Wollman and David R. Stras AUTHORING JUDGE:Jane Kelly (PUBLISHED), CONCUR AND DISSENT BY: DAVID R. STRAS [5043368] [19-2882, 19-3134] |
1. | Down syndrome issue at center of Missouri abortion law case (apnews.com) |
Submitted Wed 09/29/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 09/29/2021 3:22 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
6 pgs Civil case docketed. [4826120] 19-2882 (AEV) | ||
53 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 8/27/19, Corrected Memorandum and Order 8/27/19, Order 8/29/19, Order 8/30/19, docket entries, [4826125] 19-2882 (AEV) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 10/15/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Sammy L. Alexander, James A. DiRenna, Jeffrey S. Glaser, Jade D. James, Sarah Martin, Katherine J. Matthews, Michael L. Parson, Naveed Razzaque, Eric S. Schmitt, David E. Tannehill, Marc K. Taormina and Randall Williams due 10/15/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4826128] 19-2882 (AEV) |