Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:19-cv-01721 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 02, 2020 4:47 AM EST |
Defendant
Steven Abboud
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Phazzer Electronics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Phazzer Federal Supply
an unincorporated entity in care of Terrance Walker 212 Hillcrest Dr. #1
Reno, NV 89509 |
|
Defendant
Phazzer-USA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Diana Robinson
an individual 339 Lancaster Dr.
Davenport, FL 33897 |
|
Defendant
Phazzer Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Axon Enterprise, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Mon 09/30 4:31 PM
Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Order of Dismissal | ||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
*Order pdf
Fri 09/27 11:03 AM
ORDER re 23 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/27/2019. (JBS) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Thu 09/26 7:20 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Petersen, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Tue 09/24 9:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 21 Motion to Dismiss. A corporation must be represented by counsel. See Order 18. Defendant shall not re-file this document with the Court without retaining counsel. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/24/2019. (JBS) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Mon 09/23 3:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Fraud on the Court by Phazzer Federal Supply.(SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1A & 2 | ||
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Fri 09/20 7:22 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Petersen, Pamela) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 09/20 7:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re11 Interested persons order by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on motion to dismiss
Thu 09/19 3:07 PM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 16 Motion to Dismiss. A corporation must be represented by counsel. See Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp., 764 F.2d 1381, 1385 (11th Cir. 1985) ("The rule is well established that a corporation is an artificial entity that... cannot appear pro se, and must be represented by counsel."). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/19/2019. (JBS) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 09/18 8:03 AM
RETURN of service executed on 9/13/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Federal Supply. (Santurri, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/17 2:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss case by Phazzer Federal Supply.(JP) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons returned executed
Fri 09/13 1:15 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Holdings, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 09/12 3:53 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 09/12 3:52 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer-USA LLC. (Santurri, Ryan) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 09/12 3:50 PM
RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Interested persons order
Mon 09/09 12:02 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2019. (GNB) |
|
10 | 10
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 09/09 12:00 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2019. (GNB) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Fri 09/06 10:30 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Pamela B. Petersen, appearing on behalf of Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL-085287.) Related document:8 MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice. (BIA) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/05 5:01 PM
ORDER granting 8 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/5/2019. (RN) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/05 3:42 PM
MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice by Axon Enterprise, Inc..(Santurri, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions | ||
7 | 7
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/05 3:06 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-01721-Orl-40DCI. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ALL) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/05 2:49 PM
ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Judge Paul G. Byron, with his consent, for consideration with related case 6:16-cv-366-Orl-40LRH. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/5/2019. (GNB) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Thu 09/05 11:22 AM
NOTICE to counsel Pamela B. Peterson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk).ctp (SPM) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Thu 09/05 11:18 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Steven Abboud, Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Phazzer Federal Supply, Phazzer Holdings, Inc., Phazzer-USA LLC, Diana Robinson. (SPM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Thu 09/05 11:09 AM
Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint with exhibits | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/04 3:00 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1721-Orl-37DCI. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/04 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Steven Abboud, Does 1-20, Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., PhaZZer Holdings, Inc., Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Phazzer Federal Supply, Phazzer-USA LLC, Diana Robinson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15878639) filed by Axon Enterprise, Inc..(Santurri, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 7,444,939, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - PhaZZer IP, LLC Launches Licensed U.S. Suppliers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart Phazzer 1-DC15 (enjoined) cartridge, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Phazzer's New 1-NDC15 (new) cartridge, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons to Phazzer Electronics, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons to Steven Abboud, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons to Diana Robinson, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons to Phazzer-USA LLC, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons to Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons to PhaZZer Holdings, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons to Phazzer Federal Supply |