Patagonia, Inc. v. Kimberly McHugh
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-07666 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 02, 2020 12:34 AM PST |
Defendant
Kimberly McHugh
|
|
Plaintiff
Patagonia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Tue 04/21 5:35 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
28 | 28
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Tue 04/21 5:34 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
27 | 27
7
pgs
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge Permanent Injunction
Tue 04/21 5:28 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt, Defendant must pay Patagonia attorneys' fees in the amount of $5,800.. pursuant to the schedule set forth in Local Rule 55-3. Defendant has infringed eleven of Patagonia's copyrighted works, and must pay Patagonia statutory damages in the amount of $10,000 per work infringed, for a total of $110,000. Defendant must also pay Patagonia post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 USC 1961(a). Defendant and all persons in active concert or participation with her are permanently enjoined. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
26 | 26
order
Default Judgment
Tue 04/21 5:17 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OFDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT AGAINST DEFENDANTS (DKT.23 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is GRANTED-IN-PART. A corresponding default judgment and permanent injunction in accordance with the terms of this Order will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Default Judgment
Wed 12/11 1:58 PM
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION23 Hearing held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a rul ing will be issued, subject to the Court's determination on recusal. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lom) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 11/04 7:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendent Kimberly McHugh23 served on November 4, 2019. (Weil, Alan) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 11/04 6:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendent Kimberly McHugh filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Weil, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Morgan E. Smith, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 of the Declaration of Morgan E. Smith, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Robert Tadlock, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 of the Declaration of Robert Tadlock, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction | ||
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 10/28 1:09 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DKT.21 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On October 24, 2019, default was entered against Defendant. Dkt. 21. The Court sets the hearing on the motion for default judgment for December 9, 2019 at 8:30 am, which shall be served on Defendant and filed with the Court no later than November 4, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 10/24 4:41 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Kimberly McHugh dba Our Little Corner. (jp) |
|
20 | 20
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Thu 10/24 4:36 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST for Default Judgment15 by Clerk of Court to Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Request is premature and, therefore, stricken. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 10/22 2:13 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Patagonia, Inc., re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Kimberly McHugh18 served on 10/22/2019. (Weil, Alan) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Tue 10/22 2:09 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Kimberly McHugh filed by plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Weil, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Morgan E. Smith in Support of Request to Enter Default Against Defendant Kimberly McHugh D/B/A Our Little Corner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint) | ||
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Substitute Attorney
Mon 10/21 4:41 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Alan J Weil for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc., in place and stead of Gregory S Gilchrist, Ryan T Bricker11 . (jp) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 10/16 9:36 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Default Judgment against Defendant Kimberly McHugh d/b/a Our Little Corner15 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Clerk to Enter Default - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) No Entry of Default on file. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 10/14 5:00 PM
REQUEST for Default Judgment against Defendant Kimberly McHugh d/b/a Our Little Corner filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Smith, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Morgan E. Smith in Support of Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Defendant Kimberly McHugh d/b/a Our Little Corner, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit A (Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint) | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 10/14 2:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc., upon Defendant Kimberly McHugh served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimberly McHugh, d/b/a Our Little Corner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Morgan) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 10/11 9:23 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Morgan Elizabeth Smith counsel for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. Adding Morgan E. Smith as counsel of record for Patagonia, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Attorney Morgan Elizabeth Smith added to party Patagonia, Inc.(pty:pla))(Smith, Morgan) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 10/01 12:55 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shauna E Woods counsel for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. Adding Shauna E. Woods as counsel of record for Patagonia, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. (Attorney Shauna E Woods added to party Patagonia, Inc.(pty:pla))(Woods, Shauna) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Mon 09/30 5:55 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Alan Jay Weil in place of attorney Gregory S. Gilchrist and Attorneys Ryan T. Bricker and Alexandra N. Martinez filed by plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Attorney Alan Jay Weil added to party Patagonia, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Weil, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
81
pgs
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Sat 09/07 2:09 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/05 1:55 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Kimberly McHugh. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 09/05 1:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 09/05 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 09/04 5:18 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Patagonia, Inc.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 09/04 5:16 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Patagonia, Inc.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 09/04 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc., (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Wed 09/04 5:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 09/04 5:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Bricker, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/04 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24379614 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan T Bricker added to party Patagonia, Inc.(pty:pla))(Bricker, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |