New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:19-cv-08359
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2019 4:05 PM EDT
Defendant
United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Plaintiff
Relevent Sports, LLC
Represented By
Adam Dale
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Jeffrey L. Kessler
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Jonathan J Amoona
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Angela Aziza Smedley
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info


1. Relevent files federal antitrust lawsuit vs. U.S. Soccer (si.com)
Submitted Tue 09/10/2019
Docket last updated: 09/16/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2019
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 5:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Soccer Federation, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service was accepted by Jiancarlos Degracias, Process Specialist (CT Corporation System). Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Amoona, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order Tue 6:03 PM
ORDER: The Court, having found that good cause exists, HEREBY ORDERS that Relevent Sports, LLC may file a redacted version of its Complaint on the public docket and an unredacted version of its Complaint under seal. This order is without prejudice to any action by the Judge to which this case is assigned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty Part I on 9/9/2019) (ne)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Tue 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Order . Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Amoona, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Tue 11:41 AM
DECLARATION of Jonathan J. Amoona in Support re:1 Order. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC. (Amoona, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11:39 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RSE Ventures, LLC for Relevent Sports, LLC. Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC.(Amoona, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Sealed Document Tue 9:02 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 3:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) (jgo)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401243541)Document filed by Relevent Sports, LLC.(pne) (jgo)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs order Order Mon 3:28 PM
ORDER - TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL: COMPLAINT/PETITION ONLY (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/9/2019) (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 3:30 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 3:30 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 3:31 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (pne)
Related: [-]