New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-bk-45422
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2019
Terminated:Sep 11, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Absolut Facilities Management, LLC
255 Warner Ave
Roslyn Heights, NY 11577-1000
Represented By
Schuyler G. Carroll
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/11 8:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jonathan Bodner on behalf of ABS DIP, LLC (Bodner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Declaration Wed 09/11 5:19 AM
Declaration Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC Related [+] (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,4 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364 filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,5 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,6 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,7 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,8 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,9 Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,10 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,11 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,13 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC,14 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor Absolut Facilities Management, LLC
14 14 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 4:55 AM
Motion to Authorize/Direct Debtors Motion For Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes And Assessments and (II) Directing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 4:17 AM
Emergency Motion to Authorize/Direct Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Debtors to (A) Pay and Honor Prepetition Employee Obligations, and (B) Maintain and Continue Certain Compensation and Benefit Programs Postpetition; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 3:51 AM
Motion to Authorize/Direct Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Insurance Coverage Entered into Prepetition, (B) Pay and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, Including Broker Fees and Premium Financing Obligations; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 3:36 AM
Emergency Motion to Authorize/Direct For Interim And Final Orders (I) Authorizing The Debtors to (A) Continue Using their Cash Management System and (B) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms; (II) Waiving Certain Deposit Guidelines; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 3:25 AM
Emergency Motion to Authorize/Direct Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
9 9 33 pgs motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Wed 09/11 2:47 AM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim : (A) Establishing Deadlines for Filing Proofs of Claim, Including Requests for Payment Under Section 503(B)(9) of The Bankruptcy Code; and (B) Approving Form and Manner of Notice of Deadlines Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 2:16 AM
Motion to Authorize/Direct Debtors to File Under Seal Separate Schedule F, Matrix and Other Documents Containing Patient Information, (II) to Authorize Certain Procedures to Maintain the Confidentiality of Patient Information (III) to Modify Notice to Patients, And (IV) For Relief From Required Form of Mailing Matrix with Regard to Separate Matrix Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 09/11 1:51 AM
Motion to Authorize/Direct DEBTORS TO (I) FILE A CONSOLIDATED LIST OF CREDITORS, (II) FILE A CONSOLIDATED LIST OF THE THIRTY LARGEST UNSECURED CREDITORS, (III) REDACT CERTAIN PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION OF INDIVIDUAL CREDITORS AND CURRENT AND FORMER EMPLOYEES; AND (IV) MAIL INITIAL NOTICES Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 09/11 1:19 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Continuation of Utility Service Wed 09/11 1:10 AM
Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364 Wed 09/11 12:31 AM
Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (I) AUTHORIZING DEBTORS TO (A) OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(c)(1), 364(c)(2), 364(c)(3), 364(d)(1), AND 364(e) AND (B) USE CASH COLLATERAL Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
3 3 103 pgs misc List of Creditors Wed 09/11 12:20 AM
List of Creditors Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
2 2 14 pgs motion Joint Administration Wed 09/11 12:07 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 19-45422 with Case(s) 19-45423 19-45424 19-45425 19-45426 19-45427, 19-45428 19-45429 Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Wed 09/11 8:03 AM
The above case is related to : 19-45423 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Allegany, LLC; 19-45424 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Aurora Park, LLC; 19-45425 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport, LLC; 19-45426 ess Absolut at Orchard Brooke, LLC; 19-45427 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Orchard Park, LLC; 19-45428 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Three Rivers, LLC; 19-45429 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Westfield, LLC (cjm)
Related: [-]
court Intra-Office Transfer (Bankruptcy) Wed 09/11 9:40 AM
Pursuant to standing order dated 3/21/2002, case number 19-45422 is hereby transferred to the appropriate office under case number 19-76260 (cjm)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 09/11 9:43 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 09/10 10:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Facilities Management, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/8/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 01/8/2020. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Tue 09/10 10:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 19-45422 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18415697. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1