Snyder et al v. Greens Road of Florida LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-62342 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2020 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Green Roads Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Brook Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Terry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 01/04 10:38 AM
ORDER Of Dismissal With Prejudice. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Thu 12/31 2:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry (Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Wed 12/09 3:02 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re28 Memorandum,,,, (Second Notice) by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC (McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Colette v. CV Scis., Inc | ||
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Wed 10/07 11:28 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re28 Memorandum,,,, by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC (McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Ahumada v. Global Widget, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Ahumada v. Global Widget Status Report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Ahumada v. Global Widget Amended Class Action Complaint | ||
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Tue 10/06 9:33 AM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re31 Reply to Response to Motion, to Lift Stay by Brook Snyder (Streisfeld, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ballard, et al. v. Bhang Corporation, et al | ||
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/13 5:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Lift Stay re25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. (Streisfeld, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 07/29 4:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re27 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Lift Stay re25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Brook Snyder. Replies due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/29/2020. (pb00) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 07/29 2:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to28 Memorandum,,,, by Brook Snyder.(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
28
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Mon 07/27 4:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re27 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Lift Stay re25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC.(McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Feb 26 2020 Remarks of Dr. Stephen Hahn FDA Commissioner regarding CBD, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-July 21 2020 FDA In Brief: FDA Issues Draft Guidance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-July 21 2020 FDA Guidance on Quality Considerations for Cannabis Research, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-July 23 2020 Record of FDA Submission of Cannabidiol Enforcement Policy to Executive Office of President, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-July 23 2020 Article FDA Submits CBD Enforcement Policy for Review, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Jan. 13 2020 House Bill 5587, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-July 2020 FDA Report, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-June 16 2020 Citizen Petition to FDA from Council for Responsible Nutrition, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-June 17 2020 FDA Acknowledgement of Citizen Petition, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Nov. 14 2019 Citizen Petition to FDA from Consumer Healthcare Products Association, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11-Potter v. PotNetwork Holdings Docket, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12-Feb. 25 2020 Potter v. PotNetwork Holdings Reply Brief | ||
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/13 5:52 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Lift Stay re25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Brook Snyder.(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 01/09 9:58 AM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 01/03 12:25 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's Motion seeking a STAY based on the primary jurisdiction doctrine is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 12/16 4:07 PM
ORDER Re-setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 12/06 4:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. (McManus, John) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 12/05 12:46 PM
ORDER to File Appendix. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 11/26 1:47 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part20 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Replies due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 11/25 11:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC.(McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 11/22 6:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) filed by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. Replies due by 11/29/2019.(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 11/01 1:58 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC(McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 11/01 11:11 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Responses due by 11/22/2019. Initial Planning Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 10/30 4:10 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry.(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/25 4:45 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) ( Responses due by 11/8/2019) by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC.(McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Exemplar Labels for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG CBD Gummies, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Exemplar Certificates of Analysis for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG Gummies, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Exemplar Website Printouts for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG Gummies, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Ken Mark Declaration | ||
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 10/10 11:59 AM
ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Answer due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 10/10 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Adrian Horky on behalf of GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Attorney Kenneth Adrian Horky added to party GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC(pty:dft). (Horky, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 10/10 9:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC.(McManus, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/10 9:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC (McManus, John) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 10/10 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Luger McManus on behalf of GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Attorney John Luger McManus added to party GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC(pty:dft). (McManus, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/08 3:03 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Melissa S. Weiner. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/08 3:01 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Joseph C. Bourne. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/08 1:21 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Melissa S. Weiner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047511 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. Responses due by 10/22/2019(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/08 1:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph C. Bourne. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047498 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. Responses due by 10/22/2019(Tropin, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/30 3:39 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 09/23 4:27 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/20 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. (kpe) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 09/20 9:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/19 10:39 PM
COMPLAINT against GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11999469, filed by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry.(Ostrow, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |