Dorisimo Limited v. Wilson Sporting Goods Co
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-08155 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Central District, 840 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 18, 2020 1:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Dorisimo Limited
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wilson Sporting Goods Co
Terminated: 01/16/2020
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 01/16 10:41 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of dismissal | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 01/16 7:42 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Dorisimo Limited pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Wilson Sporting Goods Co. (Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 12/06 1:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 09/23 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Interested Parties was e-filed under the wrong event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 09/23 3:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Wilson Sporting Goods Co. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 09/23 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 09/23 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 09/20 10:54 AM
CV 30 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dorisimo Limited re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 09/20 10:44 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Dorisimo Limited. (Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/20 10:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dorisimo Limited. (Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 09/20 10:40 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Dorisimo Limited. (Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/20 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24473327 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Dorisimo Limited. (Attorney Cheryl L Hodgson added to party Dorisimo Limited(pty:pla))(Hodgson, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit US TM Reg 9936968, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EUTM Reg, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit UK TM Reg |