Venus v. Ecoco, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rachel P Kovner |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-05400 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 21, 2020 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ecoco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Venus
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/02 10:42 AM
Order Dismissing Case: The stipulation of dismissal at22 is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/02/2020. (Herrera, Isaiah) |
||
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/01 3:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vanessa Venus (Lee, C.K.) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Thu 10/01 4:14 PM
ORDER re22 Stipulation of Dismissal -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, the telephone conference previously scheduled for October 2, 2020 is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/1/2020. (Almonte, Kelly) |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/01 10:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- I will hold a telephone conference on October 2, 2020, at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed before the conference, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, I respectfully direct all counsel to call 1-877-336-1839 five minutes before the scheduled start of the conference and use access code 391-4302. Any party experiencing difficulty accessing the telephone conference should contact chambers by email at[LINK:Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/1/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/31 7:03 PM
STATUS REPORT by Vanessa Venus (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 08/24 2:26 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Vanessa Venus. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 08/24 7:47 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The conference previously scheduled for August 26, 2020 is adjourned without date. I respectfully direct the parties to file a status report by August 31, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/24/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 06/23 9:44 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- This case is already nine months old and the parties have yet to begin discovery. I will grant this request to adjourn but will not approve further delay absent the most compelling and unforeseeable of extraordinary circumstances. Moreover, in light of the delay to date and the likelihood that the parties will have an incentive to exchange information about the case informally in anticipation of mediation, I will expect to set an expedited discovery schedule if the parties do not reach a settlement agreement. The initial conference previously scheduled for June 24, 2020 is rescheduled for August 26, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/23/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/22 5:01 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference /the initial conference currently scheduled for June 24, 2020 by Ecoco, Inc.. (Mason, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 05/01 3:01 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference /initial conference scheduled for May 6, 2020, by Ecoco, Inc.. (Mason, Christopher) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 05/01 4:32 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The telephone initial conference previously scheduled for May 6, 2020 is rescheduled for June 24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/1/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Fri 04/24 4:36 PM
Letter regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to The Honorable Rachel P. Kovner from Christopher M. Mason dated April 24, 2020, by Ecoco, Inc. (Mason, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/16 6:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ecoco, Inc., filed by Vanessa Venus. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Thu 03/26 11:05 AM
Letter regarding scope of class action by Vanessa Venus (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Sunday, March 22, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Sun 03/22 11:26 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The initial conference previously scheduled for March 24, 2020 is rescheduled for May 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/22/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 03/20 5:49 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled March 24, 2020 by Ecoco, Inc.. (Mason, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 03/20 11:12 PM
Minute entry and Order for pre-motion conference before Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/19/2020. The hearing was held by teleconference. Counsel for both parties appeared. The deadline for plaintiff to amend her complaint is April 17, 2020. Defendant shall file a letter by April 24, 2020 indicating whether it continues to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Love, Alexis) |
||
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 03/18 11:15 AM
ORDER -- The initial conference scheduled for March 24, 2020 is converted to a telephone conference. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at[LINK:Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov] . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/18/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/17 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rony Guldmann on behalf of Vanessa Venus (aty to be noticed) (Guldmann, Rony) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/13 4:55 PM
ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for March 19, 2020 at 11:00 AM is converted into a telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (888) 278-0296 and type in the access code 2012636 to join the conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 3/13/2020. (Chan, Tsz) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/25 11:50 AM
ORDER granting 19-cv-0540010 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The pre-motion conference is hereby scheduled for March 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4E North before the Honorable Rachel P. Kovner. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on February 25, 2020. (Chan, Tsz) |
||
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/12 12:58 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 02/11 10:27 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference addressed to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto from Christopher M. Mason dated February 6, 2020 filed by Vanessa Venus. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/10 12:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on March 24, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than March 20, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/10/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 02/06 4:27 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference addressed to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto from Christopher M. Mason dated February 6, 2020 by Ecoco, Inc.. (Mason, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/23 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher May Mason on behalf of Ecoco, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mason, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 01/16 12:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Ecoco, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/16 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery Alan Meyer on behalf of Ecoco, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 01/16 1:18 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted and the stipulation is so ordered; Ecoco, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 6, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/16/2020. (Gutmann, Joseph) |
||
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/13 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Vanessa Venus (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 01/02 2:30 PM
ORDER -- A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that the defendant was served with the summons and complaint on November 20, 2019, and its answer was due on December 11, 2019, but to date has not been filed. No later than January 16, 2020, one of the following events must occur: (a) the defendant must file an answer, (b) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendant's time to answer, or (c) the plaintiff must file a request for a certificate of default. If none of the preceding events occurs by the deadline set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to their client and to the defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/2/2020. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 12/23 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Venus. Ecoco, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/24 4:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Ecoco, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 09/24 4:07 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 09/24 4:06 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 09/24 4:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/23 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Ecoco, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11873101, filed by Vanessa Venus. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |