New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:19-cv-09093
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2019
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2019 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Univision Communications, Inc.
Defendant
Does 1-10,
Plaintiff
Annie Leibovitz
Represented By
Michael Douglas Steger
Law Offices Of Michael D. Steger, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/06/2019 11:59 PM EST
Friday, October 25, 2019
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/25 3:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Univision Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Document filed by Annie Leibovitz. (Steger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 10/02 11:35 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/02 9:28 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Univision Communications, Inc.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 10/02 9:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Douglas Steger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Rockland;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 10/02 9:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Douglas Steger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Does 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 10/02 9:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 10/02 9:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 10/02 9:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/01 1:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Univision Communications, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Annie Leibovitz. (Steger, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/01 1:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Steger, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Tue 10/01 1:20 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Steger, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Univision Communications, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17695121)Document filed by Annie Leibovitz.(Steger, Michael)
Related: [-]