Neo4j, Inc. v. Graph Foundation, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-06226 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 29, 2020 3:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Graph Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neo4j, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 111 E. 5th Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
110 | 110
24
pgs
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Strike Order on Stipulation
Tue 02/16 9:22 AM
ORDER GRANTING 109 STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. All pending motions are hereby terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2021. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, February 15, 2021 | ||
109 | 109
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 02/15 9:53 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Neo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
108 | 108
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/12 3:30 PM
NOTICE by Neo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc. Notice of Settlement (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) |