ALCOA CORPORATION et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01261 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 28, 2020 7:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALCOA CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALCOA FUELS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARCONIC, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC.
Terminated: 12/17/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
utility
Remark
Wed 02/12 1:56 PM
Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in District of Columbia as case 1:20-cv-00375, filed 02/10/2020. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jjg) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
transfer
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer
Fri 02/07 11:26 AM
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from District of Columbia. (jjg) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Fri 02/07 11:31 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of Columbia. (jjg) |
||
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
transfer
Conditional Transfer Order
Thu 02/06 12:17 PM
Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/21 11:30 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/21/2020. (rgm) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 01/16 4:32 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint, by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Skowron, Jonathan) |
|
32 | 32
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 01/16 3:40 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 01/16 2:45 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Argentieri, Kenneth) |
|
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 01/16 2:10 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint, by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Giblin, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 12/17 6:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants, filed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Thu 12/12 2:39 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Skowron, Jonathan) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/12 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Skowron on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Skowron, Jonathan) |
|
26 | 26
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 12/12 11:33 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER.23 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/12/19. (eca) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Wed 12/11 6:10 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Union Pacific Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Giblin, Thomas) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Giblin on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Giblin, Thomas) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Protective Order
Wed 12/11 4:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
22 | 22
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Wed 12/11 12:58 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying CSX Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Argentieri, Kenneth) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Argentieri on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Argentieri, Kenneth) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Wed 12/11 8:20 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 12/05 10:31 AM
ORDER APPROVING17 Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint and Response thereto. Amended Complaint due by 12/17/2019; Responsive pleading due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/05/19. (eca) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Wed 12/04 4:20 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Amended Complaint and Response thereto by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 11/08 10:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 12/16/19 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 11/08/19. (eca) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 11/07 9:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (Rashid, Sami) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 10/29 11:18 AM
ORDER APPROVING13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall Answer no later than 11/07/19. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/29/19. (eca) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 10/28 2:12 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC. Answer due from All Defendants. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
misc
QC - No Proposed Order Attached
Fri 10/25 11:14 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) |
||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/24 3:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Sami H. Rashid to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/24 3:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Stephen R. Neuwirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Thu 10/24 12:11 PM
MOTION for attorney Sami H. Rashid to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5334450) by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (Rashid, Sami) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing from Southern District of New York | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Thu 10/24 12:06 PM
MOTION for attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5334429) by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (Neuwirth, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing from Southern District of New York | ||
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 10/23 2:14 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 10/23 2:13 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 10/23 2:11 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Wed 10/23 2:10 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Errata
Mon 10/07 4:26 PM
Errata re2 Disclosure Statement, Amended by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correction of errors. (Soller, Eric) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 10/04 8:20 AM
Judge William S. Stickman added. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (mao) |
||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 10/02 3:53 PM
Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. Judge William S. Stickman no longer assigned to case. (mao) |
||
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/01 1:47 PM
Summons Issued as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (jjg) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Tue 10/01 1:46 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying ALCOA CORPORATION as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (jjg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Tue 10/01 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5303171), filed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. (jjg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |