Original Case: 7:18-cv-02267

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-03113
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 02, 2019 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Robert S. Cantor
Represented By
Robert S. Cantor
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Represented By
Scott A. Levinson
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/02/2019 4:23 AM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert S. Cantor, FILED. [2667585] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:29 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 17 pgs Case FILED
2 2 17 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2667593] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:31 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2667597] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:32 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2667599] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:33 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2667601] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:34 AM]
Related: [-]
6 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Scott A. Levinson, Esq. for Appellee Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2667633] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:47 AM]
Related: [-]
7 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert S. Cantor, district court receipt # 465407017469, FILED.[2668159] 19-3113 [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:13 PM]
Related: [-]