Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-65768

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Wendy L Hagenau
Case #: 1:19-bk-65770
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2019
Terminated:Sep 18, 2020

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
US Star 1, LLC
11735 Pointe Pl
Roswell, GA 30076-4636
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Friday, September 18, 2020
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Fri 09/18 8:09 AM
Case Closed (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
12 12 order 01-Order Mon 08/31 3:49 PM
(Copy of Order) Order on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Cases. Entered on 8/31/2020. (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
11 11 misc P-Attorney Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 7:34 PM
Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Equity Security Holders , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor , Attorney Disclosure Statement , Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor GLOBAL NOTES, RESERVATION OF RIGHTS, AND STATEMENT OF LIMITATIONS, METHODOLOGY AND DISCLAIMER REGARDING DEBTORS SCHEDULES AND SOFAs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of US Star 1, LLC. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 12:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices Filed by Daniel H. Park on behalf of Bainbridge Management, Inc.. (Park, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 2:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices Filed by Charles H. Van Horn on behalf of Bainbridge Management, Inc.. (Van Horn, Charles)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 05, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Sun 10/06 1:05 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 10/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 5:53 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
7 7 misc Letter Thu 10/03 9:51 AM
DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE CASE JOINTLY ADMINISTERED WITH CASE NO. 19-65768 (jlc)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 10/03 8:53 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Cases. Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b). In accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, an order has been entered in this case authorizing the joint administration of this case with Chapter 11 case of In re: Star Chain, Inc. The docket in Case No. 19-65768 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings or other papers in this case, and the others jointly administered, shall be filed in the case of Star Chain, Inc., Case No. 19-6576 Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 10/2/2019. (jlc)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Wed 10/02 3:14 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Rule 1015 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 1, LLC. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/02 1:57 PM
Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 1, LLC. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Wed 10/02 10:24 AM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-65770 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 52240903. Fee Amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 10 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/02 10:18 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee $ 1717, Filed by Will B. Geer of Wiggam & Geer, LLC on behalf of US Star 1, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/30/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 1/30/2020. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]