Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-65768

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Wendy L Hagenau
Case #: 1:19-bk-65779
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2019
Terminated:Sep 18, 2020

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
US Star 12, LLC
11735 Pointe Pl
Roswell, GA 30076-4636
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Friday, September 18, 2020
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Fri 09/18 8:25 AM
Case Closed (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
11 11 order 01-Order Mon 08/31 4:01 PM
(Copy of Order) Order on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Cases. Entered on 8/31/2020. (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
10 10 misc P-Attorney Disclosure Statement Mon 11/04 7:39 PM
Attorney Disclosure Statement , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor GLOBAL NOTES, RESERVATION OF RIGHTS, AND STATEMENT OF LIMITATIONS, METHODOLOGY AND DISCLAIMER REGARDING DEBTORS SCHEDULES AND SOFAs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of US Star 12, LLC. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
9 9 misc 0-Certificate of Service Tue 10/29 5:24 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance filed by Anna Mari Humnicky on behalf of Byline Bank. Related [+] (Humnicky, Anna)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/29 5:07 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Anna Mari Humnicky on behalf of Byline Bank. (Humnicky, Anna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 05, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Sun 10/06 1:05 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 10/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
6 6 misc Letter Thu 10/03 9:56 AM
DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE CASE JOINTLY ADMINISTERED WITH CASE NO. 19-65768 (jlc)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Joint Administration, Motion for Thu 10/03 9:18 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Cases. In accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, an order has been entered in this case authorizing the joint administration of this case with Chapter 11 case of In re: Star Chain, Inc. The docket in Case No. 19-65768 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings or other papers in this case, and the others jointly administered, shall be filed in the case of Star Chain, Inc., Case No. 19-6576 Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 10/2/2019. (jlc)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Wed 10/02 3:26 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Rule 1015 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 12, LLC. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/02 2:06 PM
Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 12, LLC. (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Wed 10/02 11:09 AM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-65779 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 52241827. Fee Amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 10 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/02 10:53 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee $ 1717, Filed by Will B. Geer of Wiggam & Geer, LLC on behalf of US Star 12, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/30/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 1/30/2020. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]