US Star 21, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-65768
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-65768
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Wendy L Hagenau |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-65788 |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2020 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
US Star 21, LLC
11735 Pointe Pl
Roswell, GA 30076-4636 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
misc
06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed
Fri 09/18 9:13 AM
Case Closed (jlc) |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() (Copy of Order) Order on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Cases. Entered on 8/31/2020. (jlc) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Attorney Disclosure Statement , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor GLOBAL NOTES, RESERVATION OF RIGHTS, AND STATEMENT OF LIMITATIONS, METHODOLOGY AND DISCLAIMER REGARDING DEBTORS SCHEDULES AND SOFAs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of US Star 21, LLC. (Geer, Will) |
|
Saturday, October 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Notice Date 10/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 10/03 4:00 PM
DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE CASE JOINTLY ADMINISTERED WITH CASE NO. 19-65768 (jlc) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Cases. In accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, an order has been entered in this case authorizing the joint administration of this case with Chapter 11 case of In re: Star Chain, Inc. The docket in Case No. 19-65768 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All further pleadings or other papers in this case, and the others jointly administered, shall be filed in the case of Star Chain, Inc., Case No. 19-6576 Service by BNC. Entered on 10/2/2019. (jlc) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Rule 1015 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 21, LLC. (Rountree, William) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by William A. Rountree on behalf of US Star 21, LLC. (Rountree, William) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Wed 10/02 11:24 AM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-65788 [misc,4002aty] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 52242209. Fee Amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Fee $ 1717, Filed by Will B. Geer of Wiggam & Geer, LLC on behalf of US Star 21, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/30/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 1/30/2020. (Geer, Will) |