Original Case: 1:14-cv-08445

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-03159
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2019 4:26 AM EDT
Petitioner - Appellant
Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria Limited
Represented By
Aaron Robert Marcu
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
contact info
Petitioner - Appellant
Shell Nigeria Exploration and Production Company Limited
Represented By
Aaron Robert Marcu
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellee
Nigerian National Petroleum Corporation
Represented By
Cecilia F. Moss
Chaffetz Lindsey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/05/2019 4:23 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria Limited and Shell Nigeria Exploration and Production Company Limited, FILED. [2671162] 19-3159 [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:38 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 32 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 09/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2671165] 19-3159 [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:40 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2671166] 19-3159 [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:40 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria Limited and Shell Nigeria Exploration and Production Company Limited, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17704125, FILED.[2671168] 19-3159 [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:41 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2671169] 19-3159 [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:41 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 32 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED