Original Case: 1:19-cv-08694

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-03204
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2019
Terminated:Nov 04, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2019 4:38 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Gerard J. Sinzdak
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Mark R. Freeman
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Mazars USA, LLP
Represented By
Inbal Paz Garrity
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Nicholas Robert Tambone
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jerry D. Bernstein
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official capacity as District Attorney of the Country of New York
Represented By
James H. Graham
New York County District Attorney's Office
contact info
Carey R. Dunne
New York County District Attorney's Office
contact info
Patricia J. Bailey
New York County District Attorney's Office
contact info
Solomon Shinerock
New York County District Attorney's Office
contact info
Allen J. Vickey
New York County District Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Cameron Thomas Norris
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
contact info
William S. Consovoy
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 04 2019
OPINION, affirming in part and vacating in part the judgment of the district court and remanding the case, by RAK, DC, CFD, FILED.[2696827] [19-3204]

Docket last updated: 11/14/2019 6:17 PM EST
Monday, October 07, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. [2673574] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:42 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2673578] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:45 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17724879, FILED.[2673590] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:49 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673591] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:50 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 ATTORNEY, Cameron Thomas Norris for Donald J. Trump, in case 19-3204 , [1], ADDED.[2673616] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:58 AM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY, Solomon Shinerock for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [1], ADDED.[2673661] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 10:21 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 30+ pgs MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by email.[2673670] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 10:23 AM]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a temporary administrative stay is granted pending expedited review by a panel of the Court. A scheduling order will issue in the ordinary course. [8], by RJL, FILED. [2673680][10] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 10:28 AM]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673743] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 10:56 AM]
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to expedite briefing, [11], on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED.[2673754] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:00 AM]
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673883] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:48 AM]
Related: [-]
15 15 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE [13], [14], on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED.[2673890] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:51 AM]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, the United States Department of Justice , FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673912] 19-3204 --[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:00 PM]
Related: [-]
18 18 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae United States Department of Justice, ADDED.[2673948] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:18 PM]
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, the United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673983] 19-3204 --[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:30 PM]
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673998] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:37 PM]
Related: [-]
21 21 ATTORNEY, Mark R. Freeman for United States Department of Justice, in case 19-3204 , [19], ADDED.[2673999] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:37 PM]
Related: [-]
22 22 ATTORNEY, Carey R. Dunne for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [20], ADDED.[2674003] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:39 PM]
Related: [-]
23 23 3 pgs LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, requesting briefing dates, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674079] 19-3204 --[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB] [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:16 PM]
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674105] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:36 PM]
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States Department of Justice, requesting a date of October 11, 2019 to file a brief in support of the appellant, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674120] 19-3204 --[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB] [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:43 PM]
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674136] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:49 PM]
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674145] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:53 PM]
Related: [-]
32 32 5 pgs MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674210] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:38 PM]
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674258] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:00 PM]
Related: [-]
36 36 ATTORNEY, James H. Graham for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [34], ADDED.[2674304] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:27 PM]
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite, [14] consideration for stay pending appeal and the merits of the appeal. Appellant's brief is due on 10/11/2019 at 5:00pm. The United States Department of Justice's amicus brief in support of Appellant is due at the same time. Appellees' briefs are due on 10/15/2019 at 5:00pm. Appellant's reply brief isdue on 10/17/2019 at 5:00pm. Argument will be scheduled as early as the week of 10/21/2019. The temporary administrative stay remains in effect until argument is completed, by RJL, FILED. [2674671][38] 19-3204 --[Edited 10/08/2019 by EM] [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:43 PM]
Related: [-]
41 41 2 pgs MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite, [14] consideration for stay pending appeal and the merits of the appeal. Appellant's brief is due on 10/11/2019 at 5:00pm. The United States Department of Justice's amicus brief in support of Appellant is due at the same time. Appellees' briefs are due on 10/15/2019 at 5:00pm. Appellant's reply brief isdue on 10/17/2019 at 5:00pm. Argument will be scheduled as early as the week of 10/21/2019. The temporary administrative stay remains in effect until argument is completed, by RJL, FILED.[2675026] 19-3204 [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:12 AM]
Related: [-]