Simon v. Manhattan Mini Storage LLC, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-05890
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03165 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Oct 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2019 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant
McKinney's Shelter, AKA McGuinness Shelter, BRC
|
|
Defendant
New York Common Pantry
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carolyn Walker-Diallo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States District Court for the Southern District of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Louis L. Stanton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, case number 101190-15
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ronald Abad, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robert McPhillips, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrea Harnett-Robinson, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lisa Lombardi, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nancy Olecki, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nancy Crystal, Director Human Resources, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ariana Saunders, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Brodsky, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sirio Flores, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shel McGuinness Shelter
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UHaul of Chelsea Truck Rental Agency, New York, N.Y.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Coalition for the Homeless
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joan B. Lobis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Project Renewal, Fort Washington Men's Homeless Shelter
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Does, 121 thru 2,500
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Adult Protective Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Does, 6 to10, N.Y.P.D. Officers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
One City Mission Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Frederick Shack, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carolyn Hamrak, New York Common Pantry
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nicole Bramstedt, Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenmore Associates LP, AKA Kenmore Hall
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Manhattan Mini Storage LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Edison Properties, LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jerry Gottesman, or successor
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andy Gottesman, or successor of Gottesman Real Estate Partners
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sperber Deneberg, Kahan, PC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stephen Grimaldi, New York Common Pantry
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Neil Bogan, New York Common Pantry
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judy Secon, New York Common Pantry
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, New York Common Pantry, AKA Mr. Welch
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, Cafeteria Manager of New York Common Pantry, AKA Mohammed
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Municipal State of New York, State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Department of Homeless Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Missionaries of Charity, Queen of Peace Home
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Commissioner of Department of Homeless Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bowery Residents Committee, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Urban Pathways, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Goddard Riverside Community Center
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Salvatore Snaiderbaur, One City Mission
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
U-Haul, AKA Amerco
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Legal Assistance Group
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Cuomo, New York State Governor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Warren Wilhelm, Jr., New York City Mayor, AKA Bill DeBlasio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James P. O'Neill, New York City Police Commissioner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe 1, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Jose
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe 2, N.Y.P.D. ex-cop, AKA Hector
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Does, 1 to 4, N.Y.P.D. Officers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Scott Stringer, New York City Comptroller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Civil Court of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert Simon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/16/2019 3:26 AM EST |
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert Simon, FILED. [2672142] 19-3165 [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:36 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 15 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 09/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2672150] 19-3165 [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:39 AM] |